EP2908799 - SOFT SOLID ANTIPERSPIRANT COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING SOY WAX AND METHODS OF PREPARING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dial Corporation 19001 N. Scottsdale Road Scottsdale, AZ 85255 / US | [2015/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YARLAGADDA, Travis T. 14612 West 83rd Terrace Lenexa, Kansas 66215 / US | 02 /
AUSTIN, Haley 4237 East Juanita Avenue Gilbert, Arizona 85234 / US | [2015/35] | Representative(s) | Henkel IP Department c/o Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/35] | Ludwig, Brigitte, et al Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 13847043.0 | 27.09.2013 | [2015/35] | WO2013US62160 | Priority number, date | US201213653070 | 16.10.2012 Original published format: US201213653070 | [2015/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014062362 | Date: | 24.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2908799 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/92, A61K8/34, A61K8/30, A61K8/97, A61Q15/00 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
A61Q15/00 (EP);
A61K8/0216 (EP);
A61K8/342 (EP);
A61K8/922 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] | Title | German: | WEICHE SCHWEISSHEMMENDE FESTSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT SOJAWACHS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2015/35] | English: | SOFT SOLID ANTIPERSPIRANT COMPOSITIONS INCLUDING SOY WAX AND METHODS OF PREPARING THE SAME | [2015/35] | French: | COMPOSITION ANTITRANSPIRATION SOLIDE ET MOLLE COMPRENANT DE LA CIRE DE SOJA ET SES PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION | [2015/35] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 05.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/28] | 14.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2012005720 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0064]; table 1 *; | [AP]WO2013019383 (DIAL CORP [US], et al) [AP] 1-15 * paragraph [0022]; example 1; claims 1-8 *; | [A]WO9827939 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 18, lines 9-27; examples 1,2; claims 1-10 *; | [A]WO2011079001 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0042] - [0049] *; | [A]WO9827951 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 23, line 13 - page 24, line 24; claims 1-10 * | International search | [A]US2012039833 (BRENNAN, GAIL CHRISTINE ET AL.); | [A]WO9827939 (THE PROCTER AND GAMBLE COMPANY); | [A]US2012076867 (REMINGTON, CHRIS EJYO ET AL.); | [A]US2011038822 (PHIPPS, BRITTANY ET AL.); | [A]US2012160365 (WILLIAMS, BEREA A. R. ET AL.); | [A]US8163685 (GOLDENBERG, MICHAEL) |