EP2855523 - ANTIGEN BINDING PROTEINS THAT BIND DLL-4 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sorrento Therapeutics, Inc. 6042 Cornerstone Ct. West Suite B San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2015/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROS, Edwige 967 Beryl Street San Diego, CA 92109 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Yanliang 10945 Corte Mejillones San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 03 /
ZHOU, Heyue 10936 Via Banco San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 04 /
GASTWIRT, Randy 4083 Sequoia Street San Diego, CA 92109 / US | [2015/15] | Representative(s) | Sterling IP Orion House Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City AL7 1HH / GB | [2015/15] | Application number, filing date | 13847493.7 | 28.05.2013 | WO2013US42912 | Priority number, date | US201261654019P | 31.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261654019 P | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014062245 | Date: | 24.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2855523 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C07K16/22, A61K39/395, C12P21/08 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
C07K16/28 (EP,US);
C07K16/22 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/15] | C07K16/22, A61K39/395, C12P21/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/15] | Title | German: | ANTIGENBINDENDE PROTEINE ZUM BINDEN VON DLL-4 | [2015/15] | English: | ANTIGEN BINDING PROTEINS THAT BIND DLL-4 | [2015/15] | French: | PROTÉINES LIANT L'ANTIGÈNE QUI LIENT DLL-4 | [2015/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2014 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 21.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/20] | 07.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 17.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 21.11.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 21.11.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.12.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 21.11.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 21.11.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.12.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008042236 (ONCOMED PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12* example - *; | [I]WO2008076379 (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * example - *; | [I]WO2010032060 (MEDIMMUNE LLC [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * examples 6,8,10 * * tables 14,18-21 *; | [I]US2010292312 (YAN MINHONG [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * examples 2-8,10-12 *; | [I]US2011117079 (BENATUIL LORENZO [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * example - * * tables 22,23 * | International search | [A]US2003059937 (RUBEN STEVEN M [US], et al); | [A]US2008025980 (HARDY BRITTA [IL], et al); | [A]US2010292312 (YAN MINHONG [US], et al); | [A]US2011117079 (BENATUIL LORENZO [US], et al); | [A] - AKAHORI, Y., "IMMUNOGLOBULIN HEAVY CHAIN VHDJ REGION, PARTIAL [HOMO SAPIENS]", GENBANK, (20020702), Database accession no. BAC01307.1, XP003034291 | [A] - TIAN, C ET AL., "Immunodominance Of The VH1-46 Antibody Gene Segment In The Primary Repertoire Of Human Rotavirus-Specific B Cells Is Reduced In The Memory Compartment Through Somatic Mutation Of Nondominant Clones.", J IMMUNOL., (20080301), vol. 180, no. 5, pages 3279 - 3288, XP055174364 | [A] - CHAPAL, N ET AL., "Thyroid Peroxidase Autoantibodies Obtained From Random Single Chain Fv Libraries Contain The Same Heavy/Light Chain Combinations As Occur In Vivo.", ENDOCRINOLOGY., (200111), vol. 142, no. 11, pages 4740 - 4750, XP055174390 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.142.11.4740 | [A] - JIMENEZ-GOMEZ, G ET AL., "Modulated Selection Of IGHV Gene Somatic Hypermutation During Systemic Maturation Of Human Plasma Cells.", J LEUKOC BIOL., (201003), vol. 87, no. 3, pages 523 - 530, XP055174392 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1189/jlb.0709514 | [A] - COMBRIATO, G ET AL., "V-Lambda and J-Lambda-C-Lambda Gene Segments Of The Human Immunoglobulin Lambda Light Chain Locus Are Separated By 14 Kb And Rearrange By A Deletion Mechanism.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (199106), vol. 21, no. 6, pages 1513 - 1522, XP055174401 | [A] - SHRINER, A ET AL., "Analysis Of The Young And Elderly Variable Gene Repertoire In Response To Pneumococcal Polysaccharides Using A Reconstituted SCID Mouse Model.", VACCINE., (20061130), vol. 24, no. 49-50, pages 7159 - 7166, XP028011449 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2006.06.055 | [A] - KUROSAWA, Y., "IMMUNOGLOBULIN KAPPA LIGHT CHAIN [HOMO SAPIENS]", GENBANK, (20090106), Database accession no. BAH04733.1, XP003034292 | [A] - ADDERSON, E ET AL., "Immunoglobulin Light Chain Variable Region Gene Sequences For Human Antibodies To Haemophilus influenzae Type b Capsular Polysaccharide Are Dominated By A Limited Number Of V-Kappa and V-Lambda Segments And VJ Combinations.", J CLIN INVEST., (199203), vol. 89, no. 3, pages 729 - 738, XP009106771 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI115649 | [A] - TIAN, C ET AL., "Evidence For Preferential Ig Gene Usage And Differential TdT And Exonuclease Activities In Human Naive And Memory B Cells.", MOL IMMUNOL., (200703), vol. 44, no. 9, pages 2173 - 2183, XP005834035 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molimm.2006.11.020 |