EP2910588 - RESIN COMPOSITION, PREPREG, LAMINATE AND PRINTED-WIRING BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/35] | RESIN COMPOSITION, PREPREG, LAMINATE, AND PRINTED WIRING BOARD | ||
[2022/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company, Inc. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | [2015/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Hiroshi c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Techno Park 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 02 /
CHIBA, Tomo c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Techno Park 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 03 /
OHNISHI, Nobuyoshi c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Techno Park 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 04 /
TOMIZAWA, Katsuya c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Techno Park 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 05 /
TAKADA, Keisuke c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Techno Park 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 06 /
SHIGA, Eisuke c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Techno Park 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | 07 /
OGASHIWA, Takaaki c/o Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Company Inc. Tokyo Techno Park 1-1 Niijuku 6-chome Katsushika-ku Tokyo 125-8601 / JP | [2015/35] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/35] | Application number, filing date | 13847657.7 | 18.10.2013 | [2015/35] | WO2013JP78389 | Priority number, date | JP20120231632 | 19.10.2012 Original published format: JP 2012231632 | JP20130169894 | 19.08.2013 Original published format: JP 2013169894 | [2015/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014061812 | Date: | 24.04.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2910588 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2910588 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.04.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/02, B32B15/14, C08G59/62, C08K3/36, C08K3/34, C08G77/04, C08G77/14, C08K3/013, C08L71/12, C08L83/06, C08L63/00, C08J5/24, H05K1/03 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
C08L63/00 (EP,US);
B32B15/092 (US);
B32B15/14 (EP,US);
B32B27/06 (US);
B32B27/28 (US);
B32B27/283 (US);
B32B27/38 (US);
B32B5/024 (EP,US);
C08G59/621 (EP,US);
C08J5/244 (EP,US);
C08J5/249 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C08K3/34 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08L71/126 (EP,US);
C08L83/06 (EP,US);
H05K1/0353 (EP,US);
B32B2250/02 (EP,US);
B32B2260/021 (EP,US);
B32B2260/046 (EP,US);
B32B2262/101 (EP,US);
B32B2307/202 (EP,US);
B32B2307/206 (EP,US);
B32B2307/306 (EP,US);
B32B2457/08 (EP,US);
C08G77/045 (EP,US);
C08G77/14 (EP,US);
C08J2363/00 (EP,US);
C08J2365/00 (EP,US);
C08J2383/06 (EP,US);
C08J2463/00 (EP,US);
C08J2479/04 (EP,US);
C08J2483/06 (EP,US);
C08L2201/08 (US);
C08L2203/20 (US);
C08L2205/03 (US);
C08L2205/035 (US);
H05K2201/012 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0162 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0209 (EP,US);
H05K2201/029 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31529 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/34, C08L83/06 (EP,US);
C08K3/36, C08L83/06 (US,EP);
C08L83/06, C08L63/00, C08K3/36, C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C08L83/06, C08L71/126, C08K3/36, C08K3/013 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2015/35] | C08G59/20, B32B15/08, C08J5/24, C08K3/00, C08L63/00, H05K1/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EPOXIDHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, PREPREG, LAMINAT UND LEITERPLATTE | [2015/35] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION, PREPREG, LAMINATE AND PRINTED-WIRING BOARD | [2022/31] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE, PRÉ-IMPRÉGNÉ, STRATIFIÉ, ET TABLEAU DE CONNEXIONS IMPRIMÉ | [2015/35] |
Former [2015/35] | RESIN COMPOSITION, PREPREG, LAMINATE, AND PRINTED WIRING BOARD | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2015 | Translation filed | 07.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 07.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 15.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 22.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2020 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.11.2022 | AT | 02.11.2022 | CZ | 02.11.2022 | DK | 02.11.2022 | EE | 02.11.2022 | ES | 02.11.2022 | FI | 02.11.2022 | HR | 02.11.2022 | LT | 02.11.2022 | LV | 02.11.2022 | MC | 02.11.2022 | NL | 02.11.2022 | PL | 02.11.2022 | RO | 02.11.2022 | RS | 02.11.2022 | SE | 02.11.2022 | SI | 02.11.2022 | SK | 02.11.2022 | SM | 02.11.2022 | NO | 02.02.2023 | GR | 03.02.2023 | IS | 02.03.2023 | PT | 02.03.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2023/51] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
CZ | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NL | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
ES | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
SE | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 02.11.2022 | |
NO | 02.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2011236207 ; | [Y]US2009017316 (KATO YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-29 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011]; examples 1-4 *; | [YA]US2012247820 (MIYATAKE MASATO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12,21-29 * abstract * * example 12; table 3 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0059] * [A] 13-20; | [E]EP2716710 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [E] 1-12 * example comp 1 and 2 *; | [E]EP2886339 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [E] 1-12 * example comp 1 and 2 *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2011, no. 78, Database accession no. 2011-P41799, XP002757606 & JP2011236207 A 20111124 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [Y] 1-29 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0042] , [0062] , [0077] * * example - * | International search | [A]JPH04261461 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2007138002 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2011132416 (NAGASE CHEMTEX CORP); | [A]WO2011108524 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2011132674 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2011138865 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2011152402 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al); | [A]WO2012029690 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) | Examination | - Novolac Resins ET AL, "HOME > DIC Products > EPICLON Epoxy Resins > PHENOLITE Novolac Resins Major Product Specifications & Features Novolac resins (solid)", (20190101), URL: http://www.dic-global.com/en/products/epoxy/phenolite.html, (20191220), XP055654630 | by applicant | JPH0848001 | JPH1045872 | JP2000158589 | JP3173332B | JP2003246849 | JP2006143973 | JP2009035728 | JP2010024265 | WO2012099132 |