EP2911613 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR MATERIAL FIXATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cayenne Medical, Inc. 16597 North 92nd Street, Suite 101 Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US | [2015/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAIRD, Kevin N. 16597 North 92nd Street Suite 101 Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US | 02 /
HARPER, Derek J. 16597 North 92nd Street Suite 101 Scottsdale, AZ 85260 / US | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/11] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | ||
Former [2015/36] | HGF Limited Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13848294.8 | 16.10.2013 | [2015/36] | WO2013US65310 | Priority number, date | US201261717569P | 23.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261717569 P | [2015/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014066116 | Date: | 01.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2911613 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2911613 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/28, A61L27/56, A61F2/02 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
A61F2/0811 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0835 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0852 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0882 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0888 (US);
A61F2250/0071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR MATERIALFIXIERUNG | [2015/36] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR MATERIAL FIXATION | [2015/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR FIXATION DE MATÉRIAU | [2015/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 13.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.10.2013 | AL | 15.03.2017 | AT | 15.03.2017 | CY | 15.03.2017 | CZ | 15.03.2017 | DK | 15.03.2017 | EE | 15.03.2017 | ES | 15.03.2017 | FI | 15.03.2017 | HR | 15.03.2017 | LT | 15.03.2017 | LV | 15.03.2017 | MC | 15.03.2017 | MK | 15.03.2017 | NL | 15.03.2017 | PL | 15.03.2017 | RO | 15.03.2017 | RS | 15.03.2017 | SE | 15.03.2017 | SI | 15.03.2017 | SK | 15.03.2017 | SM | 15.03.2017 | TR | 15.03.2017 | BG | 15.06.2017 | NO | 15.06.2017 | GR | 16.06.2017 | IS | 15.07.2017 | PT | 17.07.2017 | LU | 16.10.2017 | MT | 16.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 16.10.2013 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MK | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
TR | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.10.2017 | ||
MT | 16.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 16.10.2013 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MK | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.10.2017 | ||
MT | 16.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 16.10.2013 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.10.2017 | ||
MT | 16.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.10.2013 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.10.2017 | ||
MT | 16.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.10.2017 | ||
MT | 16.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 15.03.2017 | |
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008073588 (CAYENNE MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4-9 * page 16, lines 3-8 * * page 18, lines 18-24 * * figures 1-3a,7b,12,16a,16b *; | [X]US5531792 (HUENE DONALD R [US]) [X] 1,4-6,8,9 * column 3, line 11 - column 5, line 16; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0834280 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 8, lines 23-47; figures 10,11 * | International search | [X]US7879094 (BAIRD, K. N. ET AL.); | [A]US6833005 (MANTAS, J. P. AND MANTAS, N. L.); | [A]US2002013608 (ELATTRACHE, N. ET AL.); | [A]US2006155287 (MONTGOMERY, K. D. ET AL.); | [A]US6482210 (SKIBA, J. B. AND BALDWIN, J. P.) | by applicant | US7879094 | US8206446 | US5531792 | WO2008073588 |