EP2911677 - METASTABLE SILVER NANOPARTICLE COMPOSITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanocomposix, Inc. 4878 Ronson Court Suite K San Diego, CA 92111 / US | For all designated states Sienna Labs, Inc. 3210 Merryfield Row San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2015/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLDENBURG, Steven, J. 1835 Bel Air Terrace Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 02 /
BALDWIN, Richard, K. 2475 E Street San Diego, CA 92102 / US | 03 /
HARRIS, Todd, J. 1630 Basswood Ave. Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [2016/01] |
Former [2015/36] | 01 /
OLDENBURG, Steven, J. 1440 Hotel Circle North 373 San Diego, CA 92108 / US | ||
02 /
BALDWIN, Richard, K. 2475 E Street San Diego, CA 92102 / US | |||
03 /
HARRIS, Todd, J. 1630 Basswood Ave. Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2015/36] | Application number, filing date | 13848874.7 | 25.10.2013 | [2015/36] | WO2013US66959 | Priority number, date | US201261795866P | 26.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261795866 P | [2015/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014066850 | Date: | 01.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2911677 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/38, A61L15/46, A61K9/51, A61K8/19, A61K8/02, A61K9/14, A61K45/06, A61Q17/00, A61L31/16, A61L29/16, A61L27/54, A01N59/16 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
A61K9/146 (EP,US);
A01N59/16 (EP,US);
A61K33/38 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/0241 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/143 (EP,US);
A61K9/5115 (EP,US);
A61K9/5138 (EP,US);
A61L15/46 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L29/16 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61Q17/005 (EP,US);
A61K2800/413 (EP,US);
A61K2800/621 (EP,US);
A61K2800/651 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N59/16, A01N25/34, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/38, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2015/36] | A61K33/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Title | German: | METASTABILE NANOPARTIKELKOMPOSITE | [2015/36] | English: | METASTABLE SILVER NANOPARTICLE COMPOSITES | [2015/36] | French: | COMPOSITES DE NANOPARTICULES D'ARGENT MÉTASTABLES | [2015/36] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 21.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 02.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 17.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.04.2016 | 31.10.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008150867 (INNOVA MATERIALS LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0165] , [ 175] , [ 176] , [0 94] * | International search | [Y]WO02085385 (NUCRYST PHARM CORP [CA], et al); | [Y]US2012059307 (HARRIS TODD JAMES [US], et al); | [Y]US2007104605 (HAMPDEN-SMITH MARK J [US], et al); | [Y]US2010143431 (LANDAU UWE [DE], et al); | [Y]US2010002282 (AGRAWAL ANOOP [US], et al); | [Y]US2010291224 (TONG YEN WAH [SG], et al); | [Y]US8178202 (HALAS NANCY J [US], et al); | [Y]US7270721 (HILFENHAUS PETER [DE], et al); | [Y]US2012101007 (AHERN DAMIAN [IE], et al); | [Y]US2009123509 (BERKLAND CORY [US], et al) |