EP2908768 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TREATMENT OF ANAL AND FECAL INCONTINENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMS Research Corporation 10700 Bren Road West Minnetonka, MN 55343 / US | [2015/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERMAN, Carrie, L. 10700 Bren Road West Minnetonka, Minnesota 55343 / US | 02 /
HEYS, Amanda, J. 10700 Bren Road West Minnetonka, Minnesota 55343 / US | 03 /
KHAMIS, Chaouki, A. 10700 Bren Road West Minnetonka, Minnesota 55343 / US | 04 /
ROSENBLATT, Peter, L. 10700 Bren Road West Minnetonka, Minnesota 55343 / US | [2015/35] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/35] | Willquist, Sofia Ellinor Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 13849121.2 | 22.10.2013 | [2015/35] | WO2013US66143 | Priority number, date | US201261716815P | 22.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261716815 P | [2015/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014066366 | Date: | 01.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2908768 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00, A61F2/02 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
A61F2/0045 (EP,US);
A61B17/3468 (US);
A61F2002/045 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ANAL- UND STUHLINKONTINENZ | [2015/35] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TREATMENT OF ANAL AND FECAL INCONTINENCE | [2015/35] | French: | SYSTÈME ET MÉTHODE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'INCONTINENCE ANALE ET FÉCALE | [2015/35] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 02.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008013867 (AMS RES CORP [US]) [X] 1-7 * page 22, line 11 - page 23, line 2; figure 5 *; | [X]US2012253106 (KHAMIS CHAOUKI A [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0048]; figure 1 *; | [X]WO2008085825 (AMS RES CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 26, line 7 - page 27, line 32; figure 10 *; | [A]WO2006069078 (ROSENBLATT PETER L [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2010261952 (MONTPETIT KAREN PILNEY [US], et al); | [Y]US2011082328 (GOZZI CHRISTIAN [IT], et al); | [Y]US2012253108 (FISCHER BRIAN G [US]) | by applicant | US5112344 | US5899909 | US6039686 | US6042534 | US6110101 | US6478727 | US6638211 | WO0239890 | WO02069781 | US6911003 | US2003171644 | WO2008013867 | US2012253106 | WO2008085825 | US2010105979 | US2013006048 | US7905825 | US7722528 | US7740576 | US7794385 | US7828715 | US8172745 | US8449447 | US2006260618 | US7070556 | WO2006US28828 |