EP2916653 - ANTIBIOTIC METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR BACTERIA INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Chicago 5801 South Ellis Avenue Chicago, IL 60637 / US | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAUM, Robert, S. C/o THE UNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO 5801 S. Ellis Ave. Chicago, IL 60637 / US | 02 /
BOYLE-VAVRA, Susan C/o THE UUNIVERSITY OF CHICAGO 5801 S. Ellis Ave. Chicago, IL 60637 / US | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Bösl, Raphael Konrad Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/38] | Bösl, Raphael Konrad Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13850898.1 | 01.11.2013 | [2015/38] | WO2013US68085 | Priority number, date | US201261721310P | 01.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261721310 P | [2015/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014071198 | Date: | 08.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2916653 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/18, A01N43/16, A01N63/00, A61K31/496, A61K31/4709, A61P31/04, A61K31/431, A61K31/122, A61K31/138, A61K31/7048 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
A61K31/431 (EP,US);
A61K31/05 (EP,US);
A61K31/122 (EP,US);
A61K31/138 (EP,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/381 (EP,US);
A61K31/422 (EP,US);
A61K31/4709 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/7048 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/05, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/122, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/138, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/431, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4709, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/496, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2015/38] | A01N37/18, A01N43/16, A01N63/00, A61K31/497 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Title | German: | ANTIBIOTISCHE VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR BAKTERIENINFEKTIONEN | [2015/38] | English: | ANTIBIOTIC METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR BACTERIA INFECTIONS | [2015/38] | French: | MÉTHODES ANTIBIOTIQUES ET COMPOSITIONS D'ANTIBIOTIQUE POUR DES INFECTIONS BACTÉRIENNES | [2015/38] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 01.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 20.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 27.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2017 | 30.11.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2013103780 (UNIV BOSTON [US]) [XP] 1-3,5,6,8-14 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraphs [0029] , [0051] - [0055] - [0288]; claims 1,22 *; | [XI]WO2012032360 (HELPERBY THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-14 * page 15, line 19 - line 36; claims 1,7,12,22 * * page 17, line 16 - page 20, line 19 * * page 32, line 6 - page 33, line 2 * [I] 1-14; | [XY]EP2243482 (POLICHEM SA [LU]) [X] 11-14 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010]; claims 1-10 * [Y] 1-10; | [XY]EP1149580 (PFIZER PROD INC [US]) [X] 11-14 * paragraphs [0021] , [0079] , [0080] , [0083] * [Y] 1-10 | International search | [A]US2007258996 (MOOKERJEE PRADIP [US], et al); | [A]US2010234348 (COTTAREL GUILLAUME [US], et al) | [Y] - ROHNER ET AL., "Synergistic effect of quinolones and oxacillin on methicillin-resistant Staphylococcus species.", ANTIMICROB AGENTS CHEMOTHER, (198912), vol. 33, no. 12, pages 2037 - 2041, XP055262002 | [Y] - "Noroxin (Norfloxacin)", MERCK, (201202), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20120415000000*/http://www.merck.com/product/usa/pi_circulars/n/noroxin/noroxin_pi.pdf, (20131230), XP008179693 | [Y] - "Oxacillin Injection.", DRUGS.COM., (20120206), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20120206070325/http://www.drugs.com/pro/oxacillin-injection.html, (20140101), XP055262008 | [Y] - "Nafcillin", DRUGS.COM., (20100328), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20100328053716/http://www.drugs.com/pro/nafcillin.html, (20140101), XP055262028 | [Y] - BROWN ET AL., "Pharmacokinetics of norfloxacin in dogs after single intravenous and single and multiple oral administrations of the drug.", AM J VET RES.JULY, (199007), vol. 51, no. 7, pages 1065 - 1070, XP008179697 | [A] - BOYLE-VAVRA ET AL., "VraT/YvqF is required for methicillin resistance and activation of the VraSR regulon in Staphylococcus aureus.", ANTIMICROB AGENTS CHEMOTHER, (201301), vol. 57, no. 1, pages 83 - 95, XP055262031 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.01651-12 |