EP2902994 - ACTIVE MATRIX SUBSTRATE, DISPLAY PANEL AND DISPLAY DEVICE PROVIDED WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2015/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA Kohei c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA Hidefumi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 03 /
NOMA Takeshi c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 04 /
YONEBAYASHI Ryo c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 05 /
NISHIYAMA Takayuki c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 06 /
MURATA Mitsuhiro c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 07 /
IWATA Yosuke c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/32] | Application number, filing date | 13851814.7 | 30.10.2013 | WO2013JP79424 | Priority number, date | JP20120238805 | 30.10.2012 Original published format: JP 2012238805 | JP20130116924 | 03.06.2013 Original published format: JP 2013116924 | [2015/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014069529 | Date: | 08.05.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2902994 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1362, G02F1/133, G02F1/1343, G02F1/1368, H01L51/50, G09G3/36 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
G05F1/467 (EP,US);
G09G3/3611 (CN);
G02F1/133308 (US);
G02F1/133345 (CN);
G02F1/133514 (US);
G02F1/133526 (CN);
G02F1/1343 (CN);
G02F1/1345 (CN);
G02F1/13454 (US);
G02F1/1362 (CN);
G02F1/136213 (EP,US);
G02F1/136227 (US);
G02F1/136286 (EP,CN,US);
G02F1/1368 (EP,US);
G09G3/3677 (EP,US);
H01L27/124 (US);
H01L27/1255 (US);
H03K17/04206 (EP,US);
H03K17/165 (EP,US);
H03K17/687 (EP,US);
G02F1/13456 (CN);
G02F1/136218 (CN);
G02F2201/123 (US);
G09G2300/0408 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0426 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0251 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0281 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/19] | G09F9/30, G02F1/133, G02F1/1343, G02F1/1368, H01L51/50, G09G3/36 | ||
Former IPC [2015/32] | G09F9/30, G02F1/133, G02F1/1343, G02F1/1368, H01L51/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/32] | Title | German: | AKTIVMATRIXSUBSTRAT, ANZEIGETAFEL UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2015/32] | English: | ACTIVE MATRIX SUBSTRATE, DISPLAY PANEL AND DISPLAY DEVICE PROVIDED WITH SAME | [2015/32] | French: | SUBSTRAT DE MATRICE ACTIVE, PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE LE COMPRENANT | [2015/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2015 | Translation filed | 29.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/32] | 15.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/20] | 08.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/20] | 02.01.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP19161355.3 / EP3564742 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10197851 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,2,7,9,11-14 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2007004204 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0047] - [0048] - [0056] - [0057]; figure 6 *; | [Y]US2007069214 (LEE HYUN [KR]) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0039] - [0051]; figures 1-2 *; | [Y]US2008012819 (LEE CHUL HWAN [KR], et al) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0073] - [0080]; figures 8,9 *; | [A]US2009121973 (KIM HYUNG-SOO [KR], et al) [A] 1,2,7,9,11-14* paragraphs [0036] - [0070]; figures 1-6 *; | [Y]EP2253994 (HITACHI DISPLAYS LTD [JP]) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0027] - [0030]; figure 4 *; | [Y]JP2011146620 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0037] - [0042]; figure 5 *; | [XAY]US2011248968 (SUH MI-SOOK [KR]) [X] 1,2,7,9,12-14 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0012] - [0013] - [0017] , [0027] - [0029] - [0032] , [0046] - [0047] - [0054] - [0074] - [0080] , [0083] , [0091]; figures 1-6 * [A] 11 [Y] 3,4,10; | [Y]WO2012032749 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0006] , [0053] - [0078] - [0111] - [0112]; figure 4 *; | [P]US2013188110 (MIYAMOTO TADAYOSHI [JP]); | [E]EP2669884 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1 * the whole document *; | [T] - HIDEFUMI YOSHIDA ET AL, "49.1: Flexible Flat-Panel Display Designs with Gate Driver Circuits Integrated within the Pixel Area", S I D INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS, US, (20140601), vol. 45, no. 1, doi:10.1002/j.2168-0159.2014.tb00184.x, ISSN 0097-966X, pages 701 - 704, XP055254668 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/j.2168-0159.2014.tb00184.x | International search | [A]JPH10171369 (SHARP KK); | [A]JPH11338422 (TDK CORP); | [A]JPH11352919 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2003302654 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2005142054 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]WO2010140537 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [A]JP2011048169 (HITACHI DISPLAYS LTD) | by applicant | JP2004538511 |