EP2838410 - AUTONOMOUS COVERAGE ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states iRobot Corporation 8 Crosby Drive Bedford, MA 01730 / US | [2015/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENSTEIN, Michael, T. 25 April Lane Westford, MA 01886 / US | 02 /
CHIAPPETTA, Mark c/o iRobot Corporation 8 Crosby Drive Bedford, Massachusetts 01730 / US | 03 /
SCHNITTMAN, Mark 26 Concord Avenue 2 Somerville, MA 02143 / US | 04 /
PASTORE, Andrew 26 Purvis Street Watertown, MA 02472 / US | [2015/47] |
Former [2015/09] | 01 /
ROSENSTEIN, Michael, T. 25 April Lane Westford, MA 01886 / US | ||
02 /
CHIAPPETTA, Mark 7 Samuel Road Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | |||
03 /
SCHNITTMAN, Mark 26 Concord Avenue 2 Somerville, MA 02143 / US | |||
04 /
PASTORE, Andrew 26 Purvis Street Watertown, MA 02472 / US | Representative(s) | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Chapman, Patrick Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13852108.3 | 17.10.2013 | [2016/36] | WO2013US65459 | Priority number, date | US201261721912P | 02.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261721912 P | US201313790867 | 08.03.2013 Original published format: US201313790867 | [2015/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014070470 | Date: | 08.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2838410 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2838410 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/28, B25J13/08, B25J9/16, A47L11/40, G05D1/02, G06T7/00, G06T7/20, G06T7/40, G06T7/60 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
G05D1/0219 (EP);
A47L11/4011 (US);
A47L11/4061 (US);
A47L9/2826 (US);
A47L9/2852 (EP,US);
G05D1/0246 (EP,US);
G06T7/00 (US);
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06T7/246 (EP,US);
G06T7/62 (EP,US);
G06T7/90 (EP,US);
A47L2201/06 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10021 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10024 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10028 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10048 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30261 (EP,US);
Y10S901/01 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/09] | A47L9/28, B25J13/08, B25J9/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROBOTER MIT AUTONOMEM WIRKUNGSBEREICH | [2015/09] | English: | AUTONOMOUS COVERAGE ROBOT | [2015/09] | French: | ROBOT À COUVERTURE DE SURFACE AUTONOME | [2015/09] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.2014 | Search fee paid | 03.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 28.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16187298.1 / EP3132732 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.10.2013 | AL | 07.09.2016 | AT | 07.09.2016 | BE | 07.09.2016 | CY | 07.09.2016 | CZ | 07.09.2016 | DK | 07.09.2016 | EE | 07.09.2016 | ES | 07.09.2016 | FI | 07.09.2016 | HR | 07.09.2016 | IT | 07.09.2016 | LT | 07.09.2016 | LV | 07.09.2016 | MC | 07.09.2016 | MK | 07.09.2016 | NL | 07.09.2016 | PL | 07.09.2016 | RO | 07.09.2016 | RS | 07.09.2016 | SE | 07.09.2016 | SI | 07.09.2016 | SK | 07.09.2016 | SM | 07.09.2016 | TR | 07.09.2016 | IE | 17.10.2016 | LU | 17.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | BG | 07.12.2016 | NO | 07.12.2016 | GR | 08.12.2016 | IS | 07.01.2017 | PT | 09.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 17.10.2013 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
TR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 17.10.2016 | ||
LU | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 17.10.2013 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 17.10.2016 | ||
LU | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 17.10.2013 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
MK | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 17.10.2016 | ||
LU | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
IE | 17.10.2016 | ||
LU | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
LU | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
BE | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
PL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 07.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003095707 (COLMENAREZ ANTONIO J [VE], et al) [Y] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2010067350 (ARTIVISION TECHNOLOGIES LTD [SG], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2012103367 (TANG JINJU [CN]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - David Gavilan, "Mobile Image Categorization and Retrieval using Color Blobs", In Thesis of the Department of Computer Science Graduate School of Information Science & Engineering - Tokyo Institute of Technology - Supervised by Professor Masayuki Nakajima, (20050201), pages 1 - 123, URL: http://www.img.cs.titech.ac.jp/~david/papers/gavilan-master05.pdf, (20130129), XP055051613 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - CHARLES BIBBY ET AL, Robust Real-Time Visual Tracking Using Pixel-Wise Posteriors, COMPUTER VISION ECCV 2008; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 831 - 844, (20081012), ISBN 978-3-540-88685-3, XP019109246 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-88688-4_61 | International search | [A]US2004083570 (SONG JEONG-GON [KR], et al); | [A]KR20050087644 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2008184518 (TAYLOR CHARLES E [US], et al); | [Y]KR20110127946 (S1 CORP [KR]); | [A]US2012103367 (TANG JINJU [CN]) | by applicant | US2008047092 | US2012103367 | - DAVID GAVILAN, MOBILE IMAGE CATEGORIZATION AND RETRIEVAL USING COLOR BLOBS, (20050201), pages 1 - 123 |