EP2936133 - SENSOR FOR METAL DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states King Abdullah University of Science and Technology 4700 King Abdullah University Of Science and Technology Bldg. 16, Room 4518 Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KODZIUS, Rimantas 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal 23955-6900 / SA | 02 /
ZHAO, Guoqing Academic Building Room 7163 The Hong Kong University of Science and Technology Clear Water Bay Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Feray, Valérie, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13852360.0 | 20.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013IB03241 | Priority number, date | US201261740271P | 20.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261740271 P | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014096977 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2936133 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/48 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
G01N33/20 (EP,US);
B01L3/502715 (US);
B01L3/50273 (US);
G01N27/48 (EP,US);
G01N33/0036 (EP);
G01N33/02 (EP);
G01N33/1813 (EP);
G01N33/24 (EP);
G01N33/48714 (EP);
G01N33/84 (US);
B01L2200/0605 (US);
B01L2300/0627 (US);
B01L2300/0645 (US);
B01L2300/0883 (US);
B01L2300/14 (US);
B01L2300/18 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Title | German: | SENSOR ZUR METALLDETEKTION | [2015/44] | English: | SENSOR FOR METAL DETECTION | [2015/44] | French: | CAPTEUR UTILISABLE EN VUE DE LA DÉTECTION DE MÉTAUX | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 18.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2318279 (PAUL PLEIGER MASCHINENFABRIK) [A] 1-34 * figures 1-7; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US4655880 (LIU CHUNG-CHIUN [US]) [A] 1-34 * figures 1,7 * * column 13, line 19 - line 46 * * column 6, line 12 - column 7, line 44 *; | [XAI]WO02103342 (INTERNAT TECHNOLOGY ASSOCIATES [US]) [X] 1,4,5,9,14,15,18-23,25,31 * figures 1-10; claims 18-24 * * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 11, paragraph 2 * * page 15, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 16, paragraph 2 * * page 19, paragraph 2 * * page 29, paragraph 3 * * page 39, paragraph 2 * [A] 3,6,8 [I] 2,7,10-13,16,17,24,26-30,32-34; | [A]US6699384 (LIN YUEHE [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * figures 1-9 * * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 20 *; | [IA]EP1852703 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-3,5-19,21-34 * figures 1-46 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0091] , [0102] , [0103] , [0130] , [0204] * [A] 4,20; | [A] - FANG ET AL, "Determination of trace lead and cadmium using stripping voltammetry in fluidic microchip integrated with screen-printed carbon electrodes", INSTRUMENTATION SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, TAYLOR & FRANCIS INC, US, (20120101), vol. 40, no. 6, ISSN 1073-9149, pages 590 - 602, XP009178332 [A] 1-34 * abstract * * page 592 - page 594 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/10739149.2012.706853 |