EP2919321 - ARRAY-FED REFLECTOR ANTENNA DEVICE AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING THIS DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/38] | ARRAY-FED REFLECTOR ANTENNA DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | ||
[2021/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Shinichi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
INASAWA, Yoshio c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/07] |
Former [2015/38] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13852574.6 | 14.03.2013 | [2015/38] | WO2013JP57222 | Priority number, date | JP20120245516 | 07.11.2012 Original published format: JP 2012245516 | [2015/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014073222 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2919321 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2919321 | Date: | 16.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q3/16, H01Q1/12, H01Q3/34, H01Q19/12, H01Q19/17, H01Q21/22, // H01Q25/00 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
H01Q3/16 (EP,US);
H01Q1/1264 (EP,US);
H01Q19/12 (EP,US);
H01Q19/17 (EP,US);
H01Q21/22 (EP,US);
H01Q25/007 (EP,US);
H01Q3/02 (US);
H01Q3/18 (US);
H01Q3/20 (US);
H01Q3/34 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/27] | H01Q3/18, H01Q3/24, H01Q3/26, H01Q19/10, H01Q25/00, H01Q3/16, H01Q3/20, H01Q3/34, H01Q3/02, H01Q19/12, H01Q19/17, H01Q21/22 | ||
Former IPC [2015/38] | H01Q3/18, H01Q3/24, H01Q3/26, H01Q19/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRUPPENGESPEISTE REFLEKTORANTENNENVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DIESE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/32] | English: | ARRAY-FED REFLECTOR ANTENNA DEVICE AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING THIS DEVICE | [2021/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ANTENNE À RÉFLECTEUR ALIMENTÉ PAR RÉSEAU ET PROCÉDÉ DE SON PILOTAGE | [2021/32] |
Former [2015/38] | ARRAYGESPEISTE REFLEKTORANTENNENVORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2015/38] | ARRAY-FED REFLECTOR ANTENNA DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | ||
Former [2015/38] | DISPOSITIF D'ANTENNE À RÉFLECTEUR ALIMENTÉ PAR RÉSEAU ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2015 | Translation filed | 24.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 25.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.07.2021 | 06.07.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2019 | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2013 | AL | 16.02.2022 | AT | 16.02.2022 | CY | 16.02.2022 | CZ | 16.02.2022 | DK | 16.02.2022 | EE | 16.02.2022 | ES | 16.02.2022 | FI | 16.02.2022 | HR | 16.02.2022 | LT | 16.02.2022 | LV | 16.02.2022 | MC | 16.02.2022 | MK | 16.02.2022 | MT | 16.02.2022 | NL | 16.02.2022 | PL | 16.02.2022 | RO | 16.02.2022 | RS | 16.02.2022 | SE | 16.02.2022 | SI | 16.02.2022 | SK | 16.02.2022 | SM | 16.02.2022 | IE | 14.03.2022 | LU | 14.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | BG | 16.05.2022 | GB | 16.05.2022 | NO | 16.05.2022 | GR | 17.05.2022 | IS | 16.06.2022 | PT | 16.06.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 14.03.2013 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
MK | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GB | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 14.03.2013 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CY | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GB | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 14.03.2013 | |
AL | 16.02.2022 | ||
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GB | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
GB | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SI | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
IE | 14.03.2022 | ||
LU | 14.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.02.2022 | |
AT | 16.02.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
MC | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SK | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
CZ | 16.02.2022 | ||
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
EE | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RO | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
SM | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
DK | 16.02.2022 | ||
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
IS | 16.06.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
FI | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 16.02.2022 | |
ES | 16.02.2022 | ||
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
LV | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
PL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
GR | 17.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
HR | 16.02.2022 | ||
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
RS | 16.02.2022 | ||
SE | 16.02.2022 | ||
BG | 16.05.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 16.02.2022 | |
LT | 16.02.2022 | ||
NL | 16.02.2022 | ||
NO | 16.05.2022 | ||
PT | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.02.2022 | |
NO | 16.05.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JP2009200704 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [YD] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4274098 (RENAU JACQUES, et al) [Y] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0897201 (DASSAULT ELECTRONIQUE [FR]) [Y] 1-21 * paragraphs [0031] , [0033] , [0037]; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US6441794 (TANG MINH [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 2, lines 9-53 *; | [A]EP0915529 (LORAL SPACE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0013] , [0015]; figures 1,2 * | International search | [Y]JP2002124818 (LORAL SPACE SYSTEMS INC); | [Y]JPH01276803 (THOMSON ALCATEL ESPACE); | [Y]JP2009200704 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JP2002141845 (TOSHIBA TEC KK, et al); | [A]JPH0746034 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPS6298803 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPH06334432 (NEC CORP) | Examination | US7705796 | US7564420 | EP0514886 | - ANTONIO GARCIA PINO ET AL, "A dual reflector antenna with adjustable subreflector for hybrid mechanical-electronic scanning", ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, 2006. EUCAP 2006. FIRST EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20061106), ISBN 978-92-9092-937-6, pages 1 - 6, XP031393284 | - MARTINEZ-LORENZO J A ET AL, "Zooming and Scanning Gregorian Confocal Dual Reflector Antennas", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080901), vol. 56, no. 9, doi:10.1109/TAP.2008.928777, ISSN 0018-926X, pages 2910 - 2919, XP011234077 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TAP.2008.928777 | - BAHADORI K ET AL, "An array-compensated spherical reflector antenna for a very large number of scanned beams", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20051101), vol. 53, no. 11, doi:10.1109/TAP.2005.858844, ISSN 0018-926X, pages 3547 - 3555, XP001512753 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TAP.2005.858844 | - YOUNG-BAE JUNG ET AL, "Novel Antenna System Design for Satellite Mobile Multimedia Service", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20101101), vol. 59, no. 9, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 4237 - 4247, XP011318533 | - CHAN K K ET AL, "Confocal parabolic reflector antenna design trade-offs", PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, IEEE, ANN ARBOR, MI USA, (19930628), doi:10.1109/APS.1993.385225, ISBN 978-0-7803-1246-3, pages 808 - 811vol.2, XP032366874 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APS.1993.385225 | - SUDHAKAR RAO K ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF A 45 GHZ MULTIPLE-BEAM ANTENNA FOR MILITARY SATELLITE COMMUNICATIONS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19951001), vol. 43, no. 10, doi:10.1109/8.467639, ISSN 0018-926X, pages 1036 - 1047, XP000669398 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/8.467639 | - GEORGE SKAHILL, "A Dual Reflector Antenna Scans Many Beamwidths without Loss of Gain, Resolution or Sidelobe Level", MICROWAVE JOURNAL,, (19880301), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 129 - 139, XP001384138 | by applicant | JP2009200704 |