EP2917252 - NANOCRYSTALLINE CELLULOSE (NCC) AS FUNCTIONAL SCAFFOLD FOR AMINE-CURED EPOXY NANOCOMPOSITE MATERIALS OF TUNABLE PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/38] | NCC AS FUNCTIONAL SCAFFOLD FOR AMINE-CURED EPOXY NANOCOMPOSITE MATERIALS OF TUNABLE PROPERTIES | ||
[2018/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celluforce Inc. Suite 1501 625 President-Kennedy Avenue Montréal, Québec H3A 1K2 / CA | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMAD, Wadood Yasser 109-2040 West 12th Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V6J 2G2 / CA | 02 /
SU, Shunxing 302-8300 General Currie Road Richmond, British Columbia V6Y 3X1 / CA | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Chevalier, Renaud Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2015/38] | Application number, filing date | 13852795.7 | 12.11.2013 | [2015/38] | WO2013CA50858 | Priority number, date | US201261725201P | 12.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261725201 P | [2015/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014071527 | Date: | 15.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2917252 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2917252 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 15.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08F251/02, C08G59/50, C08L63/00, C08L1/02 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
C08F251/02 (EP,US);
C08B15/06 (US);
C08G59/50 (US);
C08G59/504 (EP,US);
C08L51/02 (US);
C08L63/00 (EP,US);
C08L2312/00 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F251/02, C08F220/54 (EP,US);
C08L63/00, C08L1/02 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2015/38] | C08F251/02, C08L51/02, C08L63/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NANOKRISTALLINE ZELLULOSE (NCC) ALS FUNKTIONELLES GERÜST FÜR AMINGEHÄRTETE EPOXIDNANOVERBUNDSTOFFE MIT EINSTELLBAREN EIGENSCHAFTEN | [2018/20] | English: | NANOCRYSTALLINE CELLULOSE (NCC) AS FUNCTIONAL SCAFFOLD FOR AMINE-CURED EPOXY NANOCOMPOSITE MATERIALS OF TUNABLE PROPERTIES | [2018/20] | French: | CELLULOSE NANOCRISTALLINE (NCC) UTILISÉE COMME SUPPORT FONCTIONNEL POUR DES MATÉRIAUX NANOCOMPOSITES ÉPOXYDES DURCIS PAR UNE AMINE AYANT DES PROPRIÉTÉS POUVANT ÊTRE SPÉCIALEMENT MISES AU POINT | [2018/27] |
Former [2015/38] | NCC ALS FUNKTIONELLES GERÜST FÜR AMINGEHÄRTETE EPOXIDNANOVERBUNDSTOFFE MIT EINSTELLBAREN EIGENSCHAFTEN | ||
Former [2015/38] | NCC AS FUNCTIONAL SCAFFOLD FOR AMINE-CURED EPOXY NANOCOMPOSITE MATERIALS OF TUNABLE PROPERTIES | ||
Former [2015/38] | CELLULOSE NANOCRISTALLINE (NCC) UTILISÉE COMME ÉCHAFAUDAGE FONCTIONNEL POUR DES MATÉRIAUX NANOCOMPOSITES ÉPOXYDES DURCIS PAR UNE AMINE AYANT DES PROPRIÉTÉS POUVANT ÊTRE SPÉCIALEMENT MISES AU POINT | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/38] | 20.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.11.2013 | AL | 07.11.2018 | AT | 07.11.2018 | CY | 07.11.2018 | CZ | 07.11.2018 | DK | 07.11.2018 | EE | 07.11.2018 | ES | 07.11.2018 | FI | 07.11.2018 | HR | 07.11.2018 | IT | 07.11.2018 | LT | 07.11.2018 | LV | 07.11.2018 | MC | 07.11.2018 | MK | 07.11.2018 | NL | 07.11.2018 | PL | 07.11.2018 | RO | 07.11.2018 | RS | 07.11.2018 | SE | 07.11.2018 | SI | 07.11.2018 | SK | 07.11.2018 | SM | 07.11.2018 | TR | 07.11.2018 | IE | 12.11.2018 | LU | 12.11.2018 | MT | 12.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | BG | 07.02.2019 | NO | 07.02.2019 | GR | 08.02.2019 | IS | 07.03.2019 | PT | 07.03.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.11.2018 | ||
MT | 12.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.11.2018 | ||
MT | 12.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
IE | 12.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 12.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 07.11.2018 | |
NO | 07.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - JIE YI ET AL, "Temperature-induced chiral nematic phase changes of suspensions of poly(N,N-dimethylaminoethyl methacrylate)-grafted cellulose nanocrystals", CELLULOSE, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS (DORDRECHT), NL, (20090815), vol. 16, no. 6, doi:10.1007/S10570-009-9350-9, ISSN 1572-882X, pages 989 - 997, XP019767568 [X] 15 * Scheme 1 * [A] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10570-009-9350-9 | International search | [X]CA2786738 (FPINNOVATIONS [CA]); | [A]CA2788855 (FPINNOVATIONS [CA]); | [Y] - LIU, S. ET AL., "Durable and Regenerable Biocidal Polymers: Acyclic N-Halamine Cotton Cellulose", IND. ENG. CHEM. RES., (2006), vol. 45, no. 19, pages 6477 - 6482, XP055260337 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie060253m | [Y] - LU, J. ET AL., "Surface modification of microfibrillated cellulose for epoxy composite applications", POLYMER, (2008), vol. 49, no. 5, pages 1285 - 1296, XP029155212 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.polymer.2008.01.028 | [X] - ZOPPE, J.O. ET AL., "Poly(N-isopropylacrylamide) Brushes Grafted from Cellulose Nanocrystals via Surface-Initiated Single-Electron Transfer Living Radical Polymerization", BIOMACROMOLECULES, (2010), vol. 11, no. 10, pages 2683 - 2691, XP055260339 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bm100719d | [A] - ZOPPE, J. ET AL., "ATRP modification of cellulose fibers and nanocrystals", ABSTR. PAP., ACS NATL. MEET., (2008), vol. 235, XP008179594 | by applicant | - ARAKI, J. et al., Langmuir, (20010000), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 21 - 27 | - HABIBI, Y. et al., Biomacromolecules, (20080000), vol. 9, no. 7, pages 1974 - 1980 | - LJUNGBERG, N. et al., Biomacromolecules, (20050000), vol. 6, no. 5, pages 2732 - 2739 |