EP2920267 - HOT MELT ASSIST WATERBORN ADHESIVES AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel IP & Holding GmbH Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2015/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Tianjian 22 Runyon Street Hillsborough, New Jersey 08844 / US | 02 /
THOMPSON, Kristina 34 Studer Road Clinton, New Jersey 08809 / US | 03 /
LAYSER, James 3924 Daystar Dr Doylestown PA 18902 / US | 04 /
HARRINGTON, John 1 Stowe Court Ledgewood, New Jersey 07852 / US | 05 /
MECCIA, John 90 Becks Boulevard Ringoes, New Jersey 08851 / US | 06 /
MAMMARELLA, Robert 132 Sun Meadow Road Greer, South Carolina 29650 / US | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Henkel IP Department c/o Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | Hemme, Wilhelm Ludger Henkel AG & Co. KGaA CLI Patente Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 13855683.2 | 29.10.2013 | [2015/39] | WO2013US67215 | Priority number, date | US201261727375P | 16.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261727375 P | US201313804230 | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US201313804230 | [2015/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014078071 | Date: | 22.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2920267 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C09J201/00, C09J11/00, C09J7/02, C09J5/00 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
C09J5/08 (EP,US);
B32B29/005 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
C09J131/04 (EP,US);
B32B2255/12 (EP,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,US);
B32B2307/306 (EP,US);
B32B2553/00 (EP,US);
C09J2301/412 (EP,US);
C09J2429/00 (EP,US);
C09J2431/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1303 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09J131/04, C08K5/0016, C08K7/22 (US,EP);
C09J131/04, C08K7/22 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] | Title | German: | HEISSSCHMELZUNGSUNTERSTÜTZENDE WÄSSRIGE KLEBSTOFFE UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2015/39] | English: | HOT MELT ASSIST WATERBORN ADHESIVES AND USE THEREOF | [2015/39] | French: | ADHÉSIFS À BASE AQUEUSE AUXILIAIRE THERMOFUSIBLE ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2015/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 29.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 21.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0132796 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]) [A] 9,10 * page 37, line 1 - page 39, line 11 *; | [A]US2012048450 (FU THOMAS Z [US], et al) [A] 9,10 * claims 1,3-6 * | International search | [XY]US2007224395 (ROWITSCH ROBERT W [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0024], [0042], [0047], [0052] and [0053]; and claims 1, 5, 16, 17 and 21. * [Y] 15-20; | [Y]WO9014223 (NORDSON CORP [US]) [Y] 15-20 * See claims 1 and 3. *; | [A]JPH09217050 (CHUO RIKA KOGYO KK) [A] 1-20 * See abstract; and claim 1. *; | [A]JP2001207146 (SAIDEN CHEMICAL IND CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * See claim 1. *; | [A]EP1634897 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1-20 * See claim 1. * |