EP2922872 - BISPECIFIC EGFR/C-MET ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/40] | BISPECIFIC EGFR/c-Met ANTIBODIES | ||
[2018/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2023 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: SM | published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Biotech, Inc. 800/850 Ridgeview Drive Horsham, PA 19044 / US | [2015/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIU, Mark 1400 McKean Road Spring House Pennsylvania 19477 / US | 02 /
MOORES, Sheri 1400 McKean Road Spring House Pennsylvania 19477 / US | 03 /
NEIJSSEN, Joost Yalelaan 60 3854 Ultrecht / NL | 04 /
PARREN, Paul Yalelaan 60 3854 Ultrecht / NL | 05 /
SCHUURMAN, Janine Yalelaan 60 3854 Ultrecht / NL | [2018/20] |
Former [2015/40] | 01 /
CHIU, Mark 1400 McKean Road Spring House Pennsylvania 19477 / US | ||
02 /
MOORES, Sheri 1400 McKean Road Spring House Pennsylvania 19477 / US | |||
03 /
NEIJSSEN, Joost Yalelaan 60 NL-3854 Ultrecht / NL | |||
04 /
PARREN, Paul Yalelaan 60 NL-3854 Ultrecht / NL | |||
05 /
SCHUURMAN, Janine Yalelaan 60 NL-3854 Ultrecht / NL | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2015/40] | Application number, filing date | 13856592.4 | 21.11.2013 | [2015/40] | WO2013US71288 | Priority number, date | US201261728912P | 21.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261728912 P | US201361782550P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361782550 P | US201361809541P | 08.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361809541 P | US201361864717P | 12.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361864717 P | US201361892797P | 18.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361892797 P | [2015/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014081954 | Date: | 30.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2922872 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2922872 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/00, A61K39/395, A61K31/4545, A61K31/517, A61K45/06, A61K31/437, A61K31/5377, A61K33/24, C07K16/28, A61P35/00 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
C07K16/2863 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,US);
A61K31/4545 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K33/243 (EP,EA,US);
A61K39/395 (EP,EA,US);
A61K39/3955 (EA,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,EA,KR);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/63 (EA);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4545, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/517, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K39/395, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/40] | C07K16/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] | Extension states | BA | 22.06.2015 | ME | 22.06.2015 | Title | German: | BISPEZIFISCHE EGFR/C-MET-ANTIKÖRPER | [2015/40] | English: | BISPECIFIC EGFR/C-MET ANTIBODIES | [2018/16] | French: | ANTICORPS EGFR/C-MET BISPÉCIFIQUES | [2015/40] |
Former [2015/40] | BISPECIFIC EGFR/c-Met ANTIBODIES | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/40] | 09.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 11.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18199421.1 / EP3447069 | EP20197551.3 / EP3808767 | EP23214289.3 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.04.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 11.04.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.05.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2023/32] |
Former [2019/37] | SM | 12.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO02100348 (GENMAB AS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2004056847 (GENMAB AS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1, 3; sequences 2, 4 *; | [Y]WO2011110642 (GENMAB AS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * sequences 141, 143, 101 *; | [Y]WO2011131746 (GENMAB AS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2012042026 (ABLYNX NV [BE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * examples 13-15 *; | [T]WO2014081944 (JANSSEN BIOTECH INC [US]) [T] 1-15; | [XP] - CHRISTOPH SPIESS ET AL, "Bispecific antibodies with natural architecture produced by co-culture of bacteria expressing two distinct half-antibodies", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20130707), vol. 31, no. 8, doi:10.1038/nbt.2621, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 753 - 758, XP055127867 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.2621 | International search | [A]US2005118643 (BURGESS TERESA L [US], et al); | [X]US2010254989 (BOSSENMAIER BIRGIT [DE], et al); | [A]US2011091372 (GHAYUR TARIQ [US], et al); | [A]US2011097262 (GOETSCH LILIANE [FR], et al) | Examination | WO2013055404 | by applicant | US4683195 | WO8801649 | WO9201047 | US5212290 | US5223409 | WO9413804 | US5403484 | US5427908 | US5558864 | US5571698 | US5580717 | US5643768 | WO9844001 | US5856456 | US5885793 | US5891996 | US5969108 | US6172197 | US6472147 | WO02100348 | US6521404 | US6544731 | US6555313 | US6582915 | US6593081 | US6673901 | US6737056 | WO2004056847 | US2004166544 | US2004197332 | WO2005016382 | US6969108 | US2005272083 | WO2006015371 | WO2006028936 | US7247301 | WO2008077546 | WO2008127710 | US2009042906 | WO2009030239 | US2009118127 | WO2009085462 | US2009182127 | WO2009111691 | US7589180 | US7595378 | WO2009126834 | US2010015133 | US2010028637 | WO2010039248 | US2010216708 | US2010254989 | WO2010115551 | US7842476 | US2011118144 | US2011123532 | WO2011066501 | WO2011110642 | US2011256142 | WO2011131746 | US2011274623 | WO2012042026 | US2012149876 | US2013195849 | US2013226834 | - FERGUSON et al., Annu Rev Biophys, (20080000), vol. 37, pages 353 - 73 | - MENDELSOHN et al., Oncogene, (20000000), vol. 19, pages 6550 - 6565 | - GRUNWALD et al., J Natl Cancer Inst, (20030000), vol. 95, pages 851 - 67 | - MENDELSOHN et al., Semin Oncol, (20060000), vol. 33, pages 369 - 85 | - HIRSCH et al., Ann Oncol, (20070000), vol. 18, pages 752 - 60 | - BASELGA; ARTEAGA, J Clin Oncol, (20050000), vol. 23, pages 2445 - 2459 | - GILL et al., J Biol Chem, (19840000), vol. 259, pages 7755 - 7760 | - GOLDSTEIN et al., Clin Cancer Res, (19950000), vol. 1, pages 131 1 - 1318 | - PREWETT et al., Clin Cancer Res, (19980000), vol. 4, pages 2957 - 2966 | - DE ROOCK et al., Lancet Oncol, (20100000), vol. 11, pages 753 - 762 | - LINARDOU et al., Nat Rev Clin Oncol, (20090000), vol. 6, pages 352 - 366 | - LI; PEREZ-SOLER, Targ Oncol, (20090000), vol. 4, pages 107 - 119 | - RIELY et al., Clin Cancer Res, (20060000), vol. 12, pages 839 - 44 | - COOPER et al., Nature, (19840000), vol. 311, pages 29 - 33 | - CHRISTENSEN et al., Cancer Lett, (20050000), vol. 225, pages 1 - 26 | - PETERS; ADJEI, Nat Rev Clin Oncol, (20120000), vol. 9, pages 314 - 26 | - MA et al., Cancer and Metastasis Reviews, (20030000), vol. 22, pages 309 - 325 | - STAMOS et al., The EMBO Journal, (20040000), vol. 23, pages 2325 - 2335 | - SCHMIDT et al., Oncogene, (19990000), vol. 18, pages 2343 - 2350 | - SAKAKURA et al., Chromosomes and Cancer, (19990000), vol. 24, pages 299 - 305 | - SIERRA; TSAO, Therapeutic Advances in Medical Oncology, (20110000), vol. 3, pages 21 - 35 | - ICHIMURA et al., Jpn J Cancer Res, (19960000), vol. 87, pages 1063 - 9 | - SIEGFRIED et al., Ann Thorac Surg, (19980000), vol. 66, pages 1915 - 8 | - TURKE et al., Cancer Cell, (20100000), vol. 17, pages 77 - 88 | - ENGELMAN et al., Science, (20070000), vol. 316, pages 1039 - 43 | - BEAT et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20070000), vol. 104, pages 20932 - 7 | - Journal of Clinical Oncology, (20110000), page 7505 | - ADJEI et al., Oncologist, (20110000), vol. 16, pages 788 - 99 | - BORK; DOOLITTLE, Proc Nat Acad Sci USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 8990 - 8994 | - MEINKE et al., J Bacteriol, (19930000), vol. 175, pages 1910 - 1918 | - WATANABE et al., J Biol Chem, (19900000), vol. 265, pages 15659 - 15665 | - ULLRICH et al., Nature, (19840000), vol. 309, pages 418 - 425 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. NP 005219 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. NP_001120972 | - WARD et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - WU; KABAT, J Exp Med, (19700000), vol. 132, pages 211 - 50 | - CHOTHIA; LESK, Mol Biol, (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 17 | - LEFRANC et al., Dev Comparat Immunol, (20030000), vol. 27, pages 55 - 77 | - Almagro Mol Recognit, (20040000), vol. 17, pages 132 - 43 | - AL-LAZIKANI et al., J Mol Biol, (19970000), vol. 273, pages 927 - 48 | - KNAPPIK et al., J Mol Biol, (20000000), vol. 296, pages 57 - 86 | - SHI et al., J Mol Biol, (20100000), vol. 397, pages 385 - 96 | - DOWNWARD et al., Nature, (19840000), vol. 311, pages 483 - 5 | - PANEK et al., J Pharmacol Exp Thera, (19970000), vol. 283, pages 1433 - 44 | - BATLEY et al., Life Sci, (19980000), vol. 62, pages 143 - 50 | - JACOBS et al., Protein Engineering, Design, and Selection, (20120000), vol. 25, pages 107 - 117 | - BORK; DOOLITTLE, Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 8990 - 8992 | - ODEGRIP et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A, (20040000), vol. 101, pages 2806 - 2810 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, John Wiley & Sons, Inc., (19940000), vol. 1 | - HANES; PLUCKTHUN, Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19970000), vol. 94, pages 4937 - 4942 | - ROBERTS; SZOSTAK, Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19970000), vol. 94, pages 12297 - 12302 | - LEHMANN; WYSS, Curr Opin Biotechnol, (20010000), vol. 12, pages 371 - 375 | - HALLEWELL et al., J Biol Chem, (19890000), vol. 264, pages 5260 - 5268 | - ALFTHAN et al., Protein Eng., (19950000), vol. 8, pages 725 - 731 | - ROBINSON; SAUER, Biochemistry, (19960000), vol. 35, pages 109 - 116 | - STROHL, Curr Opin Biotechnol., (20090000), vol. 20, pages 685 - 691 | - KREBS et al., J Immunol Meth, (20010000), vol. 254, pages 67 - 84 | - VAUGHAN et al., Nature Biotechnology, (19960000), vol. 14, pages 309 - 314 | - SHEETS et al., PITAS (USA, (19980000), vol. 95, pages 6157 - 6162 | - HOOGENBOOM; WINTER, J Mol Biol, (19910000), vol. 227, page 381 | - MARKS et al., J Mol Biol, (19910000), vol. 222, page 581 | - SHI et al., J. Mol. Biol., (20100000), vol. 397, pages 385 - 96 | - LI et al., Cancer Cell, (20050000), vol. 7, pages 301 - 311 | - MACLENNAN et al., Acta Physiol Scand Suppl, (19980000), vol. 643, pages 55 - 67 | - SASAKI et al., Adv Biophys, (19980000), vol. 35, pages 1 - 24 | - DALL'ACQUA et al., J Biol Chem, (20060000), vol. 281, pages 23514 - 24 | - KONNO et al., Cytotechnology, (20120000), vol. 64, pages 249 - 65 | - SHIELDS et al., J Biol Chem, (20020000), vol. 277, pages 26733 - 26740 | - OLIVIER et al., MAbs, vol. 2, no. 4, page 2010 | - SHINKAWA et al., J Biol Chem, (20030000), vol. 278, pages 3466 - 3473 | - MORI et al., Biotechnol Bioeng, (20040000), vol. 88, pages 901 - 908 | - FERRARA et al., J Biol Chem, (20060000), vol. 281, pages 5032 - 5036 | - FERRARA et al., Biotechnol Bioeng, (20060000), vol. 93, pages 851 - 861 | - XHOU et al., Biotechnol Bioeng, (20080000), vol. 99, pages 652 - 65 | - HYNES; LANE, Nature Reviews Cancer, (20050000), vol. 5, pages 341 - 354 | - SHIELDS et al., J Biol Chem, (20020000), vol. 277, pages 26733 - 40 | - NAKATA; GOTOH, Expert Opin Ther Targets, (20120000), vol. 16, pages 771 - 781 | - JANNE; JOHNSON, Clin Cancer Res, (20060000), vol. 12, no. 14, pages 4416s - 4420s | - CAPPUZZO et al., J Natl Cancer Inst, (20050000), vol. 97, pages 643 - 55 | - VAN CUTSEM et al., N Eng J Med, (20090000), vol. 360, pages 1408 - 1417 | - LIEVRE et al., J Clin Oncol, (20080000), vol. 26, pages 374 - 379 | - AMADO et al., J Clin Oncol, (20080000), vol. 26, pages 1626 - 1634m | - "Pharmaceutical Manufacturing", Remington: The Science and Practice of Pharmacy, Lipincott Williams and Wilkins, (20060000), pages 691 - 1092 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Science, Mack Publishing Company | - MAATTA et al., Mol Biol Cell, (20060000), vol. 17, pages 67 - 79 | - BIRTALAN et al., J Mol Biol, (20080000), vol. 377, pages 1518 - 28 | - OLSON et al., Protein Sci, (20070000), vol. 16, pages 476 - 84 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 183321-74-6 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 205923-56-4 | - FREDERICK, "NCI-Navy Medical oncology Cell Line supplement", J Cell Biochem, (19960000), vol. 24 | - TRACY S., cancer Res, (20040000), vol. 64, pages 7241 - 4 | - SHIMAMURA T., cancer Res, (20050000), vol. 65, pages 6401 - 8 | - SCALLON et al., Mol Immunol, (20070000), vol. 44, pages 1524 - 1534 | - TIMMERMAN et al., J Mol Recognition, (20070000), vol. 20, page 283 | - SLOOTSTRA et al., Molecular Diversity, (19960000), vol. 1, pages 87 - 96 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 439081-18-2 |