EP2923235 - ENERGY-EFFICIENT FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexeon Energy Solutions LLC 251 Fuller Road CESTM L-240 Albany, NY 12203 / US | [2015/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FERNANDO, Pirmal, M. 1533 Ravanusa Drive Henderson, NV 89052 / US | 02 /
FISCHER, Stephen, E. 15710 Parrish Road Berthoud, CO 80513 / US | [2015/40] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/27] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | ||
Former [2015/40] | Casey, Alan Michael FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 13856805.0 | 18.11.2013 | [2015/40] | WO2013US70508 | Priority number, date | US201261729166P | 21.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261729166 P | [2015/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014081653 | Date: | 30.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2923235 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2923235 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.05.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13, G02F1/133, G02F1/1339, E06B9/24, G02B5/28, B32B17/06, B32B27/36 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
B32B17/10 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
E06B3/6775 (US);
E06B9/24 (EP,US);
G02B5/282 (EP,US);
B32B2307/42 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/40] | G02F1/13, G02F1/133, G02F1/1339 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEEFFIZIENTER FILM | [2015/40] | English: | ENERGY-EFFICIENT FILM | [2015/40] | French: | FILM ÉCO-ÉNERGÉTIQUE | [2015/40] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/40] | 09.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2020 | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/24] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 15.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.05.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 15.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.05.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.2017 | 30.11.2017 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.05.2018 | 30.11.2018 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   22.05.2019 | 30.11.2020 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.11.2013 | AL | 07.07.2021 | AT | 07.07.2021 | CY | 07.07.2021 | CZ | 07.07.2021 | DK | 07.07.2021 | EE | 07.07.2021 | ES | 07.07.2021 | FI | 07.07.2021 | HR | 07.07.2021 | IT | 07.07.2021 | LT | 07.07.2021 | LV | 07.07.2021 | MC | 07.07.2021 | MK | 07.07.2021 | MT | 07.07.2021 | NL | 07.07.2021 | PL | 07.07.2021 | RO | 07.07.2021 | RS | 07.07.2021 | SE | 07.07.2021 | SI | 07.07.2021 | SK | 07.07.2021 | SM | 07.07.2021 | BG | 07.10.2021 | NO | 07.10.2021 | GR | 08.10.2021 | IS | 07.11.2021 | PT | 08.11.2021 | GB | 18.11.2021 | IE | 18.11.2021 | LU | 18.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | FR | 30.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 18.11.2013 | |
AL | 07.07.2021 | ||
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
MK | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
GB | 18.11.2021 | ||
IE | 18.11.2021 | ||
LU | 18.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 18.11.2013 | |
AL | 07.07.2021 | ||
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
GB | 18.11.2021 | ||
IE | 18.11.2021 | ||
LU | 18.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 18.11.2013 | |
AL | 07.07.2021 | ||
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
GB | 18.11.2021 | ||
IE | 18.11.2021 | ||
LU | 18.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
GB | 18.11.2021 | ||
IE | 18.11.2021 | ||
LU | 18.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
FR | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
GB | 18.11.2021 | ||
IE | 18.11.2021 | ||
LU | 18.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
GB | 18.11.2021 | ||
LU | 18.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
LU | 18.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
LU | 18.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1457531 (CLAUDGEN LTD) [A] 1,13* page 2, line 40 - page 3, line 47; figure 2; claims 13-15 *; | [IA]JPH02154228 (TOSHIBA CORP) [I] 1,3,4,6,8 * abstract * [A] 13; | [IA]US5307190 (WAKITA NAOHIDE [JP], et al) [I] 13 * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 57; figures 3,5a; claims 7-12 * [A] 1-9,14,15; | [IA]US5479285 (BURKE RANDAL A [US]) [I] 1,6-8 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 41; figures 5,9 * [A] 13; | [I]WO2010032068 (PILKINGTON GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [I] 10-12 * page 1, line 6 - line 21; figure 1a * * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 27; figures 2a-2c; claims 1-6 *; | [A]CN202383391U (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO) [A] 10-12 * figure . *; | [AP]WO2013036386 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [AP] 10-12 * page 4, line 26 - line 31; figure .; claim - * | International search | [Y]EP0816902 (CENTRAL RESEARCH LAB LTD [GB], et al); | [Y]WO9838547 (REVEO INC [US], et al); | [A]US6285435 (INOUE KAZUO [JP], et al); | [X]WO03083523 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US], et al); | [A]US7352428 (ANDERSON GRADY K [US], et al); | [X]US2010045924 (POWERS RICHARD M [US], et al) | by applicant | JPH02154228 | US5307190 |