EP2925362 - ANTIBODIES AGAINST CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emergent BioSolutions Canada Inc. 155 Innovation Drive Winnipeg MB R3T 5Y3 / CA | [2018/36] |
Former [2015/41] | For all designated states CNJ HOLDINGS, INC 155 Innovation Drive Winnipeg, MB R3T 5Y3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERRY, Jody 3541 Cay Drive Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | 02 /
CASSAN, Robyn 44 Hindley Avenue Winnipeg, MB R2M 1P4 / CA | 03 /
JOHNSTONE, Darrell 81 Rampart Bay Winnipeg, MB R3T ON2 / CA | 04 /
SAWARD, Laura 917 Kilkenny Drive Winnipeg, MB R3T 3Z4 / CA | 05 /
GEORGE, Joyee, Antony 6 Kinlock Lane Winnipeg, MB R3T 6A6 / CA | [2015/41] | Representative(s) | MacLean, Martin Robert Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/41] | Jappy, John William Graham Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 13857740.8 | 29.11.2013 | [2015/41] | WO2013US72467 | Priority number, date | US201261730790P | 28.11.2012 Original published format: US 201261730790 P | [2015/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014085749 | Date: | 05.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2925362 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/40, C12P21/08, C07K16/00 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
C07K16/1282 (EP,US);
A61K39/40 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE | [2015/41] | English: | ANTIBODIES AGAINST CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE | [2015/41] | French: | ANTICORPS DIRIGÉS CONTRE CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE | [2015/41] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 25.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/48] | 19.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2018 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 25.04.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 25.04.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO2011130650 (PROGENICS PHARM INC [US], et al) [ID] 1-17 * figures 2D, 10, 11, 13, 17a, 17C, 18B, 23, 36, 37, 40,; examples 1,2, 3B, 4-6, 8-10; table 7 *; | [A] - MCKAY BROWN ET AL, "Tolerance to single, but not multiple, amino acid replacements in antibody V-H CDR2: A means of minimizing B cell wastage from somatic hypermutation?", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (19960101), vol. 156, no. 9, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 3285 - 3291, XP002649029 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2002164326 (YOUNG JAMES F [US], et al); | [A]US2005042664 (WU HERREN [US], et al); | [A]US2007021595 (HONG HYO J [KR]); | [A]WO2007065037 (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al); | [A]US2008286269 (VIOLETTE SHELIA M [US], et al); | [A]US2010104553 (FREY GERHARD [US], et al); | [A]US2010233182 (AMBROSINO DONNA [US], et al) |