EP2925643 - SIDE-FLEXING CONVEYORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REGAL BELOIT AMERICA, INC. 200 State Street Beloit, WI 53511 / US | [2016/20] |
Former [2015/41] | For all designated states Solus Industrial Innovations, LLC 7120 New Buffington Road Florence, KY 41042 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARMA, Apaar A-79 Rama Green City Bilaspur Chattisgarh 495006 / IN | 02 /
CHOUGULE, Shivakumar Flat No 2 Building B-11 Jai Bajrang Raj Park Keshav Nagar Chainchwad Pune Maharashtra 411033 / IN | [2015/41] | Representative(s) | Ripamonti, Enrico Giambrocono & C. S.p.A., Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [2015/41] | Application number, filing date | 13859583.0 | 27.11.2013 | [2015/41] | WO2013US72377 | Priority number, date | IN2012MUM3396 | 29.11.2012 Original published format: IN 3396MU2012 | [2017/16] |
Former [2015/41] | INMM33962012 | 29.11.2012 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014085688 | Date: | 05.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2925643 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65G17/08 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
B65G17/086 (EP,US);
B65G15/30 (US);
B65G2207/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Title | German: | FÖRDERER MIT SEITLICHER BIEGUNG | [2015/41] | English: | SIDE-FLEXING CONVEYORS | [2015/41] | French: | TRANSPORTEURS À FLEXION LATÉRALE | [2015/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/41] | 13.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 27.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5782340 (DOLAN REX H [US]) [I] 1-7,9-18 * figures 1,2 *; | [XI]US6073756 (DAMKJAER POUL ERIK [DK], et al) [X] 1,3,8-12 * column 7, lines 1-28 * * figures 1-20 * [I] 6,7,13-18; | [A]US6382404 (GULDENFELS DIETER [CH]) [A] 1,8 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP1260459 (UNI CHAINS AS [DK]) [Y] 6,7 * figures 1-7 *; | [I]WO2004041685 (GEBO IND [FR], et al) [I] 1-18* figures 1-3 *; | [I]US2004112720 (GULDENFELS DIETER [CH], et al) [I] 1-3,5-18 * paragraph [0021] * * figures 1-15 *; | [XYI]DE202008008337U (SYSTEM PLAST SPA [IT]) [X] 1-5,9-12 * figures 1-8 * [Y] 6,7 [I] 13-18; | [I]WO2012074389 (REXNORD FLATTOP EUROPE BV [NL], et al) [I] 1-4,6-18 * page 1, lines 17-22 * * page 6, line 18 - page 7, line 13 * * figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]US5217110 (SPANGLER MICHAEL L [US], et al); | [X]US6073756 (DAMKJAER POUL ERIK [DK], et al); | [A]US6345715 (PALMAER ERIC K [US]); | [Y]US2005241922 (PETROVIC ZMAJ [FR]); | [A]US2008023304 (ELSNER DIETMAR [DE]) | by applicant | DE202008008337U | WO2012074389 |