EP2910018 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING VIDEO DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2015/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POMETUN, Sergey apt.25 2 Ak.Koroliova St. Kyiv 03148 / UA | 02 /
DOROGOVTSEV, Dmytro apt.70 10 Ak.Koroliova St. Kyiv 03148 / UA | 03 /
KOSHEL, Maksym app. 10 b.16 Zghurivka Kyivska str. Kyiv 07600 / UA | 04 /
VOLKOVA, Svitlana apt.22 8 Poliovyi Lane Kyiv 03057 / UA | 05 /
SKAKUN, Anton apt.1 4 Kotovskogo St. Sumy region Romny 42004 / UA | 06 /
RYZHYKOVA, Daria 55 Kibenka St. Kyiv region Boyarka 08150 / UA | [2015/35] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2015/35] | Application number, filing date | 13860138.0 | 04.12.2013 | [2015/35] | WO2013KR11134 | Priority number, date | KR20120139825 | 04.12.2012 Original published format: KR 20120139825 | [2015/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014088303 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2910018 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/62 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
H04N19/59 (EP,US);
H04N7/24 (KR);
H04N19/132 (EP,US);
H04N19/18 (EP,US);
H04N19/44 (EP,US);
H04N19/597 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/35] | H04N7/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON VIDEODATEN | [2015/35] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING VIDEO DATA | [2015/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES VIDÉO | [2015/35] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 22.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 23.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/49] | 26.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.12.2018 | 04.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1617678 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0117] * * figure 2 ** paragraph [0145] *; | [X] - VASS J ET AL, "Efficient three-dimensional wavelet codecs for networked video communications", IMAGE PROCESSING, 1999. ICIP 99. PROCEEDINGS. 1999 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON - KOBE, JAPAN 24-28 OCT. 1999, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (19991024), vol. 3, doi:10.1109/ICIP.1999.817178, ISBN 978-0-7803-5467-8, pages 565 - 569, XP010368886 [X] 1-15 * page 565, paragraphs 2,3 - page 567; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1999.817178 | International search | [A]KR930009416 (INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION); | [A]US5715004 (CHUN KANG-WOOK [KR], et al); | [A]KR20020026254 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V.); | [A]KR20030081469 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORPORATION); | [A]KR20030096082 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.) | by applicant | EP1617678 |