EP2928303 - FACTOR VIII MUTATION REPAIR AND TOLERANCE INDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haplomics, Inc. 458 Edgewood Ave. Atlanta, GA 30303 / US | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | For all designated states The Government of the United States of America, as represented by The Department of Veterans Affairs 810 Vermont Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20420 / US | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LATERZA, Vincent 526 Durand Drive Atlanta, GA 30307 / US | 02 /
HOWARD, Tommy, E. 2703 Ruhland Ave. Apt. 3 Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Thom, Russell Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 13860153.9 | 06.12.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013US73751 | Priority number, date | US201261734678P | 07.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261734678 P | US201361888424P | 08.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361888424 P | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014089541 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2928303 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.01.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01N63/00, C12N5/00, C12N1/00, C12N5/071 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
C07K14/755 (EP,US);
A61K48/0066 (US);
C12N15/90 (EP,US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C12N2830/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Title | German: | FAKTOR-VIII-MUTATIONSREPARATUR UND TOLERANZINDUKTION | [2015/42] | English: | FACTOR VIII MUTATION REPAIR AND TOLERANCE INDUCTION | [2015/42] | French: | RÉPARATION DE LA MUTATION DU FACTEUR VIII ET INDUCTION DE LA TOLÉRANCE | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 05.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 21.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/48] | 21.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.09.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.06.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 07.06.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.06.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.06.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 21.06.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.07.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 21.04.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.05.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.06.2018 | 31.12.2018 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2019 | 31.12.2019 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2020 | 31.12.2022 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004037977 (CALIFORNIA INST OF THECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2012051343 (PHILADELPHIA CHILDREN HOSPITAL [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * [0004], [0005], [0008]-[0009], [0032], [0094], [0012], [0123], [0100]*,[0017], [0018], [0031], [0013], [0027], [0063], [0129], [0153], [0050], [0147]-[0148] *The description has an error in the numbering [0100]* is between [0125] and [0126].;; examples 1 ,3, 5; claim 5 *; | [E]WO2014186585 (SANGAMO BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) [E] 1-7,10,12,13 * [0009]-[0010], [0020]-[0022], [0028]-[0029], [0041], [0063], [0175], [0183], [0199];; claims 1-3, 6-7, 10-11, 13 *; | [Y] - H. J. LEE ET AL, "Targeted chromosomal duplications and inversions in the human genome using zinc finger nucleases", GENOME RESEARCH, (20111219), vol. 22, no. 3, doi:10.1101/gr.129635.111, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 539 - 548, XP055243750 [Y] 1-15 * p. 1 col. 2 li. 28-30, p. 6 col. 1 li. 22-p. 6 col. 2 li. 2, p. 1 col. 2 li. 28-34, p. 7 col. 2 li. 33-50 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.129635.111 | [Y] - R. D. BAGNALL ET AL, "Recurrent inversion breaking intron 1 of the factor VIII gene is a frequent cause of severe hemophilia A", BLOOD, US, (20020101), vol. 99, no. 1, doi:10.1182/blood.V99.1.168, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 168 - 174, XP055277058 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood.V99.1.168 | [Y] - NING SUN ET AL, "Recent advances in targeted genome engineering in mammalian systems", BIOTECHNOLOGY JOURNAL, (20120910), vol. 7, no. 9, doi:10.1002/biot.201200038, ISSN 1860-6768, pages 1074 - 1087, XP055187010 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/biot.201200038 | [Y] - J. ZOU ET AL, "Oxidase-deficient neutrophils from X-linked chronic granulomatous disease iPS cells: functional correction by zinc finger nuclease-mediated safe harbor targeting", BLOOD, (20110526), vol. 117, no. 21, doi:10.1182/blood-2010-12-328161, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 5561 - 5572, XP055040721 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2010-12-328161 | International search | [Y]WO2012051343 (PHILADELPHIA CHILDREN HOSPITAL [US], et al); | by applicant | US4186183 | US4217344 | US4235871 | US4261975 | US4485054 | US4501728 | US4774085 | US4797368 | US4837028 | US4897355 | US4946787 | US5049386 | WO9116024 | WO9117424 | US5173414 | WO9324641 | US6008336 | US6453242 | US6503717 | US6534261 | US6599692 | US6607882 | US6689558 | WO2004037977 | US6824978 | US6933113 | US6979539 | US7013219 | WO2006063031 | US7163824 | US2009054985 | WO2012051343 | WO2014186585 | US19470618025 | WO1994US05700 |