EP2928524 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TUNING A CLOSED-LOOP CONTROLLER FOR AN ARTIFICIAL PANCREAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Animas Corporation 200 Lawrence Drive West Chester, PA 19380 / US | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINAN, Daniel 1011 Pine Street Apt. B Philadelphia, PA 19107 / US | 02 /
MCCANN, Thomas 2121 Foxtail Drive Pottstown, PA 19464 / US | 03 /
VENUGOPALAN, Ramakrishna 3 Morris Lane Malvern, PA 19355 / US | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2015/42] | Application number, filing date | 13860173.7 | 05.12.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013US73289 | Priority number, date | US201213708032 | 07.12.2012 Original published format: US201213708032 | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014089282 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2928524 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/168, A61M31/00, G06F19/00, A61M5/172 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
A61M5/1723 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/14244 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/168 (RU);
G16H20/17 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14296 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/3553 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/3561 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/3592 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/702 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2209/01 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2230/005 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2230/201 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/42] | A61M5/168, A61M31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ABSTIMMUNG EINER STEUERUNG IN EINEM GESCHLOSSENEN KREISLAUF FÜR EINE KÜNSTLICHE BAUCHSPEICHELDRÜSE | [2015/42] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TUNING A CLOSED-LOOP CONTROLLER FOR AN ARTIFICIAL PANCREAS | [2015/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RÉGLAGE D'UNE UNITÉ DE COMMANDE À BOUCLE FERMÉE POUR UN PANCRÉAS ARTIFICIEL | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 28.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/31] | 27.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005192557 (BRAUKER JAMES H [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * claims 1-36; fig. 1, 2, 8-11; p. 1, p. 12-17; par. 0054, 0111, par. 0038, par. 0157 * * the whole document * [I] 2-4,6,7; | [I]US2009156924 (SHARIATI MOHAMMAD ALI [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * the whole document * * par. 536, 548, 333, 470;; figures 5-15 *; | [I]GB2466183 (CAMBRIDGE ENTPR LTD [GB]) [I] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [I]US2011313680 (DOYLE III FRANCIS J [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * the whole document * * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]WO2012051344 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0005] , [0 26] , [0 28] , [0 55] , [0 54] *; | [Y]US2012108932 (ROY ANIRBAN [US]) [Y] 1-7* the whole document * | International search | [A]US2002106709 (POTTS RUSSELL O [US], et al); | [A]US2008287761 (HAYTER GARY [US], et al); | [A]US2010305545 (KANDERIAN JR SAMI S [US], et al); | [Y]US2011196213 (THUKRAL AJAY [US], et al); | [A]US2011257627 (HOVORKA ROMAN [GB]); | [Y]WO2012051344 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al); | [A]US2012286953 (BOUSAMRA STEVEN A [US], et al) |