EP2928872 - COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINATION OF FKBP-BINDING IMMUNOSUPPRESSANT DRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc. 511 Benedict Avenue Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Yi Feng 105 Asension Drive Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | 02 /
WEI, Tie Q. 97 Asension Drive Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Schweitzer, Klaus, et al Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2015/42] | Application number, filing date | 13860740.3 | 03.12.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013US72716 | Priority number, date | US201213693229 | 04.12.2012 Original published format: US201213693229 | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014088987 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2928872 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2928872 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07D237/04 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
G01N33/9493 (EP,US);
A61K31/436 (EP,US);
G01N33/5308 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON FKBP-BINDENDEN IMMUNUNTERDRÜCKENDEN ARZNEIMITTELN | [2015/42] | English: | COMPOUNDS AND METHODS FOR DETERMINATION OF FKBP-BINDING IMMUNOSUPPRESSANT DRUGS | [2015/42] | French: | COMPOSÉS ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTERMINATION DE MÉDICAMENTS IMMUNOSUPPRESSEURS LIANT FKBP | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 10.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2013 | AL | 02.05.2018 | AT | 02.05.2018 | CY | 02.05.2018 | CZ | 02.05.2018 | DK | 02.05.2018 | EE | 02.05.2018 | FI | 02.05.2018 | HR | 02.05.2018 | LT | 02.05.2018 | LV | 02.05.2018 | MC | 02.05.2018 | MK | 02.05.2018 | NL | 02.05.2018 | PL | 02.05.2018 | PT | 02.05.2018 | RO | 02.05.2018 | RS | 02.05.2018 | SE | 02.05.2018 | SI | 02.05.2018 | SK | 02.05.2018 | SM | 02.05.2018 | TR | 02.05.2018 | BG | 02.08.2018 | NO | 02.08.2018 | GR | 03.08.2018 | IS | 02.09.2018 | IE | 03.12.2018 | LU | 03.12.2018 | MT | 03.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 03.12.2013 | |
AL | 02.05.2018 | ||
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MK | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
MT | 03.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
MT | 03.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
MT | 03.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
MT | 03.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 03.12.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 03.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2009020468 (SIEMENS HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * Abstract; p. 38, "Tacrolimus Assay"; claim 1. *; | [Y]WO2009079374 (SIEMENS HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * Abstract; p. 44 "Sirolimus Assay"; claim 1. *; | [X] - LI YU-TSYR ET AL, "Analysis of the Energetics of Gas-Phase Immunophilin-Ligand Complexes by Ion Spray Mass Spectrometry", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19940101), vol. 116, no. 17, doi:10.1021/JA00096A003, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 7487 - 7493, XP002375818 [X] 1 * Abstract; p. 7489 "Experimental Section". * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00096a003 | International search | [A]US5843960 (STEINER JOSEPH P [US], et al); | [A]EP0778023 (WYETH CORP [US]); | [A]US7476678 (GRAZIANI EDMUND IDRIS [US], et al); | [Y]US7714118 (REEVES CHRISTOPHER [US], et al); | [Y]US2011318754 (WEI TIE Q [US]) | by applicant | US3817837 | US3996345 | US4233402 | US4275149 | US4318980 | US4661408 | US5023262 | US5089390 | US5128103 | US5135863 | US5147529 | US5151348 | US5158871 | US5185243 | US5302532 | US5328828 | US5340716 | US5354693 | US5422284 | US5434051 | US5447870 | US5616719 | US6033890 | US6090567 | US7078495 | US7186518 | WO2009020468 | WO2009079374 | US7842475 | - NGO; LENHOFF, FEBS Lett., (19800000), vol. 116, pages 285 - 288 | - OELLERICH, J. Clin. Chem. Clin. Biochem., (19840000), vol. 22, pages 895 - 904 | - KHANNA et al., Clin. Chem. Acta, (19890000), vol. 185, pages 231 - 240 | - CAUTRECASAS, J. Biol. Chem., (19700000), vol. 245, page 3059 |