EP2931002 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SESSION INITIALIZATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Dongcheol LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Byungjoo LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jinho LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Wookbong LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | 05 /
CHO, Hangyu LG Institute 533 Hogye 1(il)-dong Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13861330.2 | 09.12.2013 | [2015/42] | WO2013KR11349 | Priority number, date | US201261735042P | 09.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261735042 P | [2015/42] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014088378 | Date: | 12.06.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2931002 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/06, H04W76/02 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
H04W76/14 (EP,US);
H04W8/005 (EP,CN,US);
H04L65/1069 (US);
H04W80/10 (EP,CN,US);
H04W92/18 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/51 (EP,CN,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/42] | H04W80/10, H04W92/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE SITZUNGSINITIALISIERUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2015/42] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SESSION INITIALIZATION IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2015/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT UNE INITIALISATION DE SESSION DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2015/42] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2015 | Translation filed | 07.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/42] | 29.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/16] | 11.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008162742 (KONG JI-YOUNG [KR], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0035] - [0054] - [0077] - [0081]; figures 2,3,5 *; | [A]US2011191443 (PATIL MAYURESH MADHUKAR [IN], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0049] - [0050] *; | [A]WO2012115385 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0044] - [0055] *; | [A]US2012243524 (VERMA LOCHAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0053] - [0077] * | International search | [A]KR20110073239 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20120073150 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20120095572 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20120103567 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |