EP2931456 - PATTERNLESS SAND MOLD AND CORE FORMATION FOR RAPID CASTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.01.2019 [2019/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Western Michigan University Research Foundation 1903 W. Michigan Ave. Kalamazoo MI 49008 / US | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOHRA, Hemant 5058 Beckley Road Apt. 2b Kalamazoo, Michigan 49009 / US | 02 /
RAMRATTAN, Sam N. 2315 Lorraine Avenue Kalamazoo, Michigan 49008 / US | 03 /
JOYCE, Margaret K. 2506 Chippendale Drive Kalamazoo, Michigan 49009 / US | 04 /
FLEMING, Paul D. III 1119 Wickford Drive Kalamazoo, Michigan 49009 / US | 05 /
IKONOMOV, Pavel 6631 Trotwood Street Portage, Michigan 49024 / US | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne 15 St Paul's Street Leeds LS1 2JG / GB | [2015/43] | Application number, filing date | 13861582.8 | 12.12.2013 | [2015/43] | WO2013US74776 | Priority number, date | US201261737204P | 14.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261737204 P | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014093684 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2931456 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 19.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B22C9/02, B22C1/22, B29C67/00 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
B22C9/02 (EP,US);
B22C1/22 (EP,US);
B22C1/2253 (EP,US);
B29C64/153 (EP,US);
B29C64/188 (EP);
Y02P10/25 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/43] | B22C9/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Title | German: | MUSTERLOSE SANDFORM UND KERNFORMIERUNG FÜR SCHNELLES GIESSEN | [2015/43] | English: | PATTERNLESS SAND MOLD AND CORE FORMATION FOR RAPID CASTING | [2015/43] | French: | MOULE À SABLE SANS MOTIF ET FORMATION DE NOYAU POUR COULÉE RAPIDE | [2015/43] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 08.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/05] | 21.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2011155567 (PANASONIC ELEC WORKS CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0025]; figure 5 *; | [P]EP2581154 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]EP1949989 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0033]; figure 3 *; | [Y]US2002041818 (ABE SATOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figure 2 *; | [Y]EP0776713 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * column 13, lines 9-37; figures 9, 11, 18 * * column 19, lines 16-18 *; | [Y]EP0476966 (AMERICAN COLLOID CO [US]) [Y] 8,9 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH04251629 (AMERICAN COLLOID CO) | International search | [X]JPH09168840 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JPH04251629 (AMERICAN COLLOID CO); | [A]EP0776713 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]CN102397991 (YTO GROUP CORP) | [Y] - N.ZHEBIN., "Formovschik ruchnoy formovki.", VSESOYUZNOE UCHEBNO-PEDAGOGICHESKOE IZDATELSTVO PROFTEKHIZDAT, MOSKVA, (1962), page 95, XP008179510 | by applicant | EP0776713 | EP2581154 | EP1949989 | US2002041818 |