EP2932564 - IMPEDANCE CONTROLLED LGA INTERPOSER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amphenol Intercon Systems Inc. 2800 Commerce Drive Harrisburg, PA 17110 / US | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALDEN, John, D. 3 Bradford Court Mechanicsburg, PA 17055 / US | 02 /
HILEMAN, James, S. 30 Wheatfield Drive Carlisle, PA 17015 / US | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2015/43] | Application number, filing date | 13861901.0 | 12.11.2013 | [2015/43] | WO2013US69538 | Priority number, date | US201261736232P | 12.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261736232 P | US201313899095 | 21.05.2013 Original published format: US201313899095 | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014092904 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2932564 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 19.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/24, H01R12/71, // H05K3/32, H01R13/6473 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
H01R12/714 (EP,US);
H01R13/2435 (EP,US);
H01R13/2407 (EP,US);
H01R13/6473 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10378 (EP,US);
H05K3/325 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/43] | H01R13/15, H01R13/40, H01R13/646, H05K1/14, H05K1/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Title | German: | IMPEDANZGESTEUERTE LGA-ZWISCHENGLIEDBAUGRUPPE | [2015/43] | English: | IMPEDANCE CONTROLLED LGA INTERPOSER ASSEMBLY | [2015/43] | French: | ENSEMBLE INTERPOSEUR LGA COMMANDÉ EN IMPÉDANCE | [2015/43] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 17.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/29] | 24.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US7247062 (POLNYI IGOR [US]) [X] 1,7 * figure 2 * * column 1, lines 10-15,62-67 * [Y] 2,3,6,9,10 [I] 4,5,8; | [X]US7275936 (JU TED [TW]) [X] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2005026503 (TROUT DAVID A [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * figures 13-27,39-42,52-56 *; | [Y]US7559811 (POLNYI IGOR [US]) [Y] 6,9,10 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1933426 (TYCO ELECTRONICS AMP KK [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 4-17 * | International search | [X]US6290507 (NEIDICH DOUGLAS A [US], et al); | [Y]US7778041 (HOWELL DAVID GREGORY [US], et al); | [A]US6638077 (FAN ZHINENG [US], et al); | [A]RU2260255 (FEDERALNOE GOSUDARSTVENNOE UNITARNOE PREDPRIYATIE MOSKOVSKOE OPYTNO-KO); | [A]SU237745 (ING. S. OLIVETTI END KO, S.P.A.); | [A]SU993366 (VYZK USTAV MATEMAT STROJU [CS]) |