EP2933988 - INFORMATION TERMINAL DEVICE, INFORMATION TERMINAL CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO Hiromu c/o NEC CASIO Mobile Communications Ltd. 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/43] | Application number, filing date | 13861935.8 | 29.11.2013 | [2015/43] | WO2013JP82135 | Priority number, date | JP20120273907 | 14.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012273907 | [2015/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014091944 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2933988 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/667, G06F21/12, G06F21/31, H04M1/00, H04W12/06, H04L29/06 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
G06F21/31 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L63/168 (EP,US);
H04M1/66 (EP,US);
H04M1/724634 (EP,US);
H04W12/02 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/43] | H04M1/667, G06F21/12, G06F21/31, H04M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSENDGERÄT, INFORMATIONSENDGERÄTSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2015/43] | English: | INFORMATION TERMINAL DEVICE, INFORMATION TERMINAL CONTROL METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2015/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TERMINAL D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE TERMINAL D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME | [2015/43] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2015 | Translation filed | 23.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 23.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 05.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008136587 (ORR KEVIN [CA]) [X] 1,6,7 * figure 6 * * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0073] * * claims 1,5-10 * [I] 2-5; | [XI]US2011053641 (LEE JAE MYEON [KR], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * paragraph [0208] - paragraph [0210] * * paragraphs [0215] - [0217] * * figures 2,27 *[I] 2-5; | [XI]US2011130170 (HAN JAEWON [KR], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * figures 4-7,11-13 * * paragraphs [0006] , [0050] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0104] * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0117] * * claims 1,2,5 * [I] 2-5; | [XI]US2011283241 (MILLER JAMES B [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7 * figures 1,2,3B * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0042] * * claims 1,2,6,7 * [I] 2-5; | [XI]US2012084734 (WILAIRAT WEERAPAN [US]) [X] 1,6,7 * abstract * * figures 2-8 * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraphs [0060] , [0073] * [I] 2-5 | International search | [Y]JP2007235867 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2009134482 (KYOCERA CORP); | [X]US2012084734 (WILAIRAT WEERAPAN [US]); | [X]WO2012096075 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2012181847 (APPLE INC); | [XP]JP2013228953 (KYOCERA CORP) | by applicant | JP2007235867 |