EP2932460 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INTERACTIVE, REAL-TIME TABLET-BASED TUTORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boost Academy, Inc. 5353 Mission Center Road Suite 202 San Diego, California 92108 / US | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROACH, John Joshua 5353 Mission Center Road Suite 202 San Diego, California 92108 / US | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2015/43] | Application number, filing date | 13861945.7 | 12.12.2013 | [2015/43] | WO2013US74799 | Priority number, date | US201261736542P | 12.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261736542 P | US201261736554P | 13.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261736554 P | US201261736556P | 13.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261736556 P | US201261736557P | 13.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261736557 P | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014093700 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2932460 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/20, G06Q10/10, G09B5/12 | [2016/32] | CPC: |
G09B5/125 (EP,US);
G06Q10/109 (EP,US);
G06Q50/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/43] | G06Q50/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR INTERAKTIVE ECHTZEIT-UNTERWEISUNG MIT EINEM TABLET-COMPUTER | [2015/43] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INTERACTIVE, REAL-TIME TABLET-BASED TUTORING | [2015/43] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE TUTORAT INTERACTIF EN TEMPS RÉEL BASÉ SUR L'UTILISATION DE TABLETTES | [2015/43] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 07.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/35] | 21.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011268418 (JONES BOLAND T [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0150] - paragraph [0151] * * paragraph [0260] * * paragraph [0270] * * paragraph [0249] * * paragraph [0201] *; | [X]US2012254773 (VISWANATHAN SUBRAMANIAN [IN]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0051] *; | [X]US2008221963 (ALTSHULE ERIC [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0079] * | International search | [Y]US2007020604 (CHULET PRANAYA [US]); | [Y]WO2012096856 (EINSTRUCTION CORP [US], et al); | [A]US2012231434 (STANDAGE RODNEY [US]); | [A]US2010151431 (MILLER DAVID E [US]); | [A]US2010186056 (LI FAN [CN], et al) |