EP2932734 - COMMUNICATION EYEWEAR ASSEMBLY WITH SAFETY CAPABILITY ZONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Energy Telecom, Inc. 3501- N South Ponce de Leon Blvd., 393 St. Augustine, FL 32084 / US | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICKARDS, Tom 3501-B N. Ponce De Leon Blvd 393 St. Augustine, FL 32084 / US | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13863341.7 | 14.11.2013 | [2015/43] | WO2013US69994 | Priority number, date | US201213713789 | 13.12.2012 Original published format: US201213713789 | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014092921 | Date: | 19.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2932734 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, H04Q5/22, G09G5/00 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
H04R1/028 (EP,US);
G02C11/10 (EP,US);
H04R1/1016 (EP,US);
H04R2420/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSBRILLENANORDNUNG MIT SICHERHEITSKAPAZITÄTSZONE | [2015/43] | English: | COMMUNICATION EYEWEAR ASSEMBLY WITH SAFETY CAPABILITY ZONE | [2015/43] | French: | ENSEMBLE ARTICLE DE LUNETTERIE AVEC FONCTION DE COMMUNICATION, DOTÉ D'UNE CAPACITÉ D'IDENTIFICATION D'UNE ZONE DE SÉCURITÉ | [2015/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/43] | 02.02.2016 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 08.03.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/44] | 28.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2012203511 (DEVAUL RICHARD W [US], et al); | [Y]US2010061579 (RICKARDS THOMAS M [US], et al); | [YP]US2013235331 (HEINRICH MITCHELL JOSEPH [US], et al) |