EP2937442 - HEATING APPARATUS, AND COATING DEVICE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POSCO Co., Ltd 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/06] | For all designated states POSCO Co., Ltd 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu, Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | ||
Former [2022/47] | For all designated states POSCO Holdings Inc. 440, Teheran-ro Gangnam-gu Seoul 06194 / KR | ||
Former [2022/44] | For all designated states POSCO (Goedong-dong) 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 37859 / KR | ||
Former [2015/44] | For all designated states Posco (Goedong-dong) 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 790-300 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNG, Yong-Hwa Gwangyang Iron & Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si, Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | 02 /
NAM, Kyung-Hoon Gwangyang Iron & Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si, Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | 03 /
EOM, Mun-Jong Gwangyang Iron & Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si, Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | 04 /
JUNG, Woo-Sung Gwangyang Iron & Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si, Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | 05 /
HONG, Seok-Jun Gwangyang Iron & Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si, Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | 06 /
KWAK, Young-Jin Gwangyang Iron & Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si, Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | 07 /
KIM, Tae-Yeob Gwangyang Iron & Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si, Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | 08 /
LEE, Dong-Yoeul Gwangyang Iron & Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si, Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | [2022/44] |
Former [2015/44] | 01 /
JUNG, Yong-Hwa Gwangyang Iron&Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | ||
02 /
NAM, Kyung-Hoon Gwangyang Iron&Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | |||
03 /
EOM, Mun-Jong Gwangyang Iron&Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | |||
04 /
JUNG, Woo-Sung Gwangyang Iron&Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | |||
05 /
HONG, Seok-Jun Gwangyang Iron&Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | |||
06 /
KWAK, Young-Jin Gwangyang Iron&Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | |||
07 /
KIM, Tae-Yeob Gwangyang Iron&Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | |||
08 /
LEE, Dong-Yoeul Gwangyang Iron&Steel Works 700 Geumho-dong Gwangyang-si Jeollanam-do 545-711 / KR | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13865017.1 | 19.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013KR11853 | Priority number, date | KR20120151520 | 21.12.2012 Original published format: KR 20120151520 | [2015/44] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014098489 | Date: | 26.06.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2937442 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.06.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/24, C23C14/56 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C23C14/24 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/243 (US);
C23C14/246 (EP,US);
C23C14/562 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/44] | C23C14/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Title | German: | ERWÄRMUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BESCHICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2015/44] | English: | HEATING APPARATUS, AND COATING DEVICE COMPRISING SAME | [2015/44] | French: | APPAREIL DE CHAUFFAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE REVÊTEMENT LE COMPRENANT | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2015 | Translation filed | 24.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 21.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2022 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 09.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/15] | 29.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS52144383 (KINSEKISHA LAB LTD) [Y] 8-10 * abstract *; | [XY]WO2008040329 (ARDENNE ANLAGENTECH GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,11-14 * figures 1-3; claims 1-15 * [Y] 8-10; | [X]WO2010126254 (SNU PRECISION CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-7,11-14 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0063]; figures 1-6; claims 1-14 *; | [A]WO2012091390 (POSCO [KR], et al) [A] 1-14* abstract * | International search | [Y]KR20110038343 (POSCO [KR]); | [Y]KR101207719B (POSCO); | [A]KR20110035072 (POSCO [KR]) | by applicant | US2005229856 | KR20070015923 | JP2010189739 | KR20090074064 | JPS55154537 |