EP3029662 - SHIFT REGISTER UNIT AND DRIVE METHOD THEREOF, GATE DRIVE CIRCUIT AND DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Chengdu BOE Optoelectronics Technology Co., Ltd. No. 1188, Hezuo Road (West Zone) Hi-tech Development Zone Chengdu, Sichuan 611731 / CN | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Like No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
QI, Xiaojing No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/23] | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 13866488.3 | 18.10.2013 | [2016/23] | WO2013CN85521 | Priority number, date | CN201310329312 | 31.07.2013 Original published format: CN201310329312 | [2016/23] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015014026 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | ZH | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3029662 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, G11C19/18 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
G09G3/20 (EP,US);
G11C19/28 (US);
G11C19/184 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0465 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0267 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0286 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/23] | G09G3/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Title | German: | SCHIEBEREGISTEREINHEIT, ANSTEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR, GATETREIBERSCHALTUNG UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2016/23] | English: | SHIFT REGISTER UNIT AND DRIVE METHOD THEREOF, GATE DRIVE CIRCUIT AND DISPLAY DEVICE | [2016/23] | French: | UNITÉ À REGISTRE À DÉCALAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE ASSOCIÉ, CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE DE GRILLE ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2016/23] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2014 | Translation filed | 01.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2014 | Search fee paid | 01.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2014 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 01.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/39] | 23.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2343068 (LG PHILIPS LCD CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * page 13, line 4 - line 11 *; | [Y]US2012032615 (KIKUCHI TETSUO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0112] *; | [Y]US2012256817 (CHEN XI [CN], et al) [Y] 3 * abstract *; | [A]US2013010916 (JANG YONG-HO [KR], et al) [A] 3* abstract * | International search | [A]JP2007207411 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]CN102651186 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD); | [Y]CN202771779U (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD); | [Y]CN202773669U (GUANGDONG YUEBEI SOUTH CHINA TIGER PROVINCIAL NATURE RESERVE MAN OFFICE) |