EP2939348 - METHOD AND SYSTEM OF GENERATING NFC-TRANSACTION REMOTELY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2015/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROCHBERGER, Haim Haanafa 52 40600 Tel Mond / IL | 02 /
RESHEF, Ehud 16 Rabin St POB 7026 36551 Kiryat Tivon / IL | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | HGF Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/45] | Jennings, Vincent Louis HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13866531.0 | 24.06.2013 | [2015/45] | WO2013US47373 | Priority number, date | US201213727832 | 27.12.2012 Original published format: US201213727832 | [2015/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014105162 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2939348 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/40, G06Q20/00, H04W8/00 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3278 (EP,US);
G06Q20/36 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3821 (EP,US);
H04B5/72 (EP,US);
H04W76/14 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/45] | H04B5/02, G06Q20/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR REMOTE-ERZEUGUNG EINER NFC-TRANSAKTION | [2015/45] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM OF GENERATING NFC-TRANSACTION REMOTELY | [2015/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GÉNÉRATION À DISTANCE DE TRANSACTION NFC | [2015/45] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 19.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007001629 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]); | [X]GB2452020 (NEC TECHNOLOGIES [GB]); | [X]WO2009039419 (WIRELESS DYNAMICS INC [CA], et al); | [X]US2012238209 (WALKER DAVID RYAN [CA], et al) | International search | [A]US2009193500 (GRIFFIN KENT [US], et al); | [X]US2012123883 (CHARRAT BRUNO [FR]); | [A]KR20120095143 (HAREXINFOTECH INC [KR]); | [A]US2012254031 (WALKER DAVID RYAN [CA], et al); | [A]US2012323670 (FISHER MICHELLE [US]) | by applicant | WO2007001629 | GB2452020 | WO2009039419 | US2012123883 | US2012238209 | US2012254031 |