EP2941033 - METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR FEEDING BACK EARLY STOP DECODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2020/27] |
Former [2015/45] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Meiying ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
DING, Jiewei ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Tao ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2020/27] |
Former [2015/45] | Bertolotto, Simone, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 13867361.1 | 06.09.2013 | [2015/45] | WO2013CN83080 | Priority number, date | CN201210580220 | 27.12.2012 Original published format: CN201210580220 | [2015/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014101465 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2941033 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2941033 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/00, H03M13/45, H04L1/00, // H04L1/16 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
H03M13/6525 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (US);
H04L1/0025 (EP,US);
H04L1/0029 (EP,US);
H04L1/0039 (US);
H04L1/0044 (EP,US);
H04L1/0053 (EP,US);
H04W16/00 (US);
H04W52/146 (US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/21 (US);
H03M13/2975 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/45] | H04W16/00, H03M13/45 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR RÜCKKOPPLUNG VON FRÜHZEITIG ABGEBROCHENER DECODIERUNG | [2015/45] | English: | METHOD, APPARATUS AND SYSTEM FOR FEEDING BACK EARLY STOP DECODING | [2015/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SYSTÈME POUR RETOURNER DES INFORMATIONS D'ARRÊT PRÉCOCE D'UN DÉCODAGE | [2015/45] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2015 | Translation filed | 19.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 29.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 02.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.09.2013 | AL | 01.07.2020 | CY | 01.07.2020 | CZ | 01.07.2020 | DK | 01.07.2020 | EE | 01.07.2020 | FI | 01.07.2020 | HR | 01.07.2020 | IT | 01.07.2020 | LT | 01.07.2020 | LV | 01.07.2020 | MC | 01.07.2020 | MK | 01.07.2020 | MT | 01.07.2020 | NL | 01.07.2020 | PL | 01.07.2020 | RO | 01.07.2020 | RS | 01.07.2020 | SE | 01.07.2020 | SI | 01.07.2020 | SK | 01.07.2020 | SM | 01.07.2020 | TR | 01.07.2020 | IE | 06.09.2020 | LU | 06.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | BG | 01.10.2020 | GB | 01.10.2020 | NO | 01.10.2020 | GR | 02.10.2020 | IS | 01.11.2020 | PT | 02.11.2020 | DE | 01.04.2021 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 06.09.2013 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
MT | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
TR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IE | 06.09.2020 | ||
LU | 06.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GB | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
DE | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
TR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IE | 06.09.2020 | ||
LU | 06.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GB | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
DE | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
IE | 06.09.2020 | ||
LU | 06.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GB | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
DE | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
IE | 06.09.2020 | ||
LU | 06.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
DE | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 06.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
DE | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 06.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
DE | 01.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 06.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 06.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | BG | 01.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6781970 (OVESJOE FREDRIK BENGT [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 29 - line 63 * * column 4, line 60 - line 65 ** column 7, line 15 - line 21 *; | [A]US2006176976 (PEDERSEN KENT [DK], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0073] *; | [A]US2007218883 (SEBIRE BENOIST [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0016] , [0 23] , [0 31] * * paragraphs [0056] , [0 57] *; | [X]US2012281675 (LIANG JIYE [CN], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraphs [0049] , [0 58] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraphs [0115] , [ 116] * | International search | [A]WO0178292 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al); | [A]CN1516376 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN102427601 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN102668612 (QUALCOMM INC) |