EP2938351 - SHORT-ACTING FACTOR VII POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coagulant Therapeutics Corporation 48-6, Gangnam-daero 5F, Hansock Building, Yangjae-dong Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | [2019/28] |
Former [2019/25] | For all designated states Bayer Healthcare LLC 100 Bayer Boulevard Whippany, NJ 07981-0915 / US | ||
Former [2015/45] | For all designated states Bayer Healthcare LLC 555 White Plains Road, 5th Floor Tarrytown, NY 10591-5097 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUZON, Maxine 1033 Park Street Hercules, California 94547 / US | 02 /
HERMISTON, Terry 305 E. Strawberry Drive Mill Valley, California 94941 / US | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/26] | Greaves Brewster LLP Copa House Station Road Cheddar, Somerset BS27 3AH / GB | ||
Former [2015/45] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 13867801.6 | 23.12.2013 | [2015/45] | WO2013US77405 | Priority number, date | US201261745674P | 24.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261745674 P | US201361787026P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361787026 P | [2015/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014105784 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2938351 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2938351 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2938351 | Date: | 31.07.2019 | [2019/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K38/48, C12N9/64 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
C12N9/6437 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/4846 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P7/00 (EP,IL);
A61P7/04 (EP,IL);
C12Y304/21021 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/45] | A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KURZFRISTIG WIRKENDE FAKTOR-VII-POLYPEPTIDE | [2015/45] | English: | SHORT-ACTING FACTOR VII POLYPEPTIDES | [2015/45] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES DE FACTEUR VII À COURTE ACTION | [2015/45] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 31.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16196780.7 / EP3165232 | EP19181784.0 / EP3572090 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2013 | AL | 26.06.2019 | CY | 26.06.2019 | CZ | 26.06.2019 | EE | 26.06.2019 | FI | 26.06.2019 | HR | 26.06.2019 | IT | 26.06.2019 | LT | 26.06.2019 | LV | 26.06.2019 | MC | 26.06.2019 | MK | 26.06.2019 | MT | 26.06.2019 | RO | 26.06.2019 | RS | 26.06.2019 | SE | 26.06.2019 | SI | 26.06.2019 | SK | 26.06.2019 | SM | 26.06.2019 | TR | 26.06.2019 | BG | 26.09.2019 | NO | 26.09.2019 | GR | 27.09.2019 | IS | 26.10.2019 | PT | 28.10.2019 | LU | 23.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 23.12.2013 | |
AL | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
MT | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 23.12.2013 | |
AL | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RS | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - SEESTED TORBEN ET AL, "The unsialylated subpopulation of recombinant activated factor VII binds to the asialo-glycoprotein receptor (ASGPR) on primary rat hepatocytes", THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, SCHATTAUER GMBH, DE, (20101210), vol. 104, no. 6, doi:10.1160/TH10-06-0356, ISSN 0340-6245, pages 1166 - 1173, XP008139984 [X] 1-7 * abstract * * Introduction * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1160/TH10-06-0356 | [X] - APPA RUPA S ET AL, "Investigating clearance mechanisms for recombinant activated factor VII in a perfused liver model", THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, SCHATTAUER GMBH, DE, (20100801), vol. 104, no. 2, ISSN 0340-6245, pages 243 - 251, XP009156273 [X] 1-7 * abstract * * the whole document * * Especially * * page 247; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1160/TH09-10-0723 | International search | [Y]WO03093465 (MAXYGEN APS [DK], et al); | [A]WO2006114105 (MAXYGEN HOLDINGS LTD, et al); | [A]WO2007013993 (MAXYGEN HOLDINGS LTD, et al); | [X]US2010028939 (BEHRENS CARSTEN [DK], et al) | by applicant | US5180583 | US2008058255 | US8008252 | - DICKINSON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci USA, (19960000), vol. 93, pages 14379 - 14384 | - IWANAGA et al., Thromb. Haemost., (19990800), page 466 | - TOSO et al., "Lack of Heavy Chain Glycosylation in Patient with Factor VII Deficiency Not Responsible for Mutant FVIIa Activity", Blood, (20001116), vol. 96, no. 11, page 79b | - FEBS Lett., (19880000), vol. 238, no. 1, pages 31 - 34 | - CALICETI P; VERONESE FM, "Pharmacokinetic and biodistribution properties of poly(ethylene glycol)-protein conjugates", Adv Drug Deliv Rev., (20030000), vol. 55, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1016/S0169-409X(03)00108-X, pages 1261 - 77, XP003001867 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-409X(03)00108-X | - WEINSTEIN T et al., "Distribution of glycosaminoglycans in rat renal tubular epithelium", J Am Soc Nephrol., (19970000), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 586 - 95 | - CHOI HS et al., "Renal clearance of quantum dots", Nat Biotechnol., (20070000), vol. 25, no. 10, pages 1165 - 70 | - BYRNE B. et al., "Sialic acids: carbohydrate moieties that influence the biological and physical properties of biopharmaceutical proteins and living cells", Drug Discovery Today, (20070000), vol. 12, no. 7-8, doi:doi:10.1016/j.drudis.2007.02.010, page 319, XP022003236 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.drudis.2007.02.010 | - SAMBROOK et al., Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, Cold Spring Harbor | - GRAHAM et al., J. Gen. Virol., (19770000), vol. 36, pages 59 - 72 | - WAECHTER; BASERGA, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19820000), vol. 79, pages 1106 - 1110 | - URLAUB; CHASIN, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19800000), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220 | - URLAUB et al., Cell, (19830000), vol. 33, pages 405 - 412 |