EP2941015 - SOUND GENERATOR, SOUND GENERATING APPARATUS, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOCERA Corporation 6, Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2015/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAZATO, Kentarou c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | 02 /
FUKUOKA, Shuichi c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | 03 /
KUSHIMA, Noriyuki c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | 04 /
HIRAYAMA, Takeshi c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | 05 /
TAKAHASHI, Tooru c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | 06 /
MURAHASHI, Masato c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION 6 Takeda Tobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/45] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13867808.1 | 21.12.2013 | [2015/45] | WO2013JP84381 | Priority number, date | JP20120283051 | 26.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012283051 | [2015/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014103970 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2941015 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04R7/04, H04R7/18, H04R17/00 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
H04R17/00 (EP,US);
H04R7/04 (EP,US);
H04R7/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Title | German: | SCHALLGENERATOR, SCHALLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2015/45] | English: | SOUND GENERATOR, SOUND GENERATING APPARATUS, AND ELECTRONIC APPARATUS | [2015/45] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR DE SON, APPAREIL DE GÉNÉRATION DE SON ET APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2015/45] | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2015 | Translation filed | 22.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 22.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 16.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/34] | 24.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010224437 (BOOTH JEFFREY DAVIS [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0087] * * figures 1,9,12 * [I] 6,7; | [XPI]EP2587837 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [XP] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1,2 * [I] 6,7; | [XI]WO2011162002 (KYOCERA CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1,2 * [I] 6,7; | [XI]US2012119617 (TAKAHASHI MASATAKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5 * paragraphs [0077] , [0092] , [0130] - [0136]; figures 3-5 * [I] 6,7; | [XI]US2006269087 (JOHNSON KEVIN M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0014] - [0018] - [0027]; figures 1-5 * [I] 6,7; | [I]WO2008115643 (KNOWLES ELECTRONICS LLC [US], et al) [I] 1-5 * paragraphs [0012] , [0020]; figures 5,6 * | International search | WO2010106736 [ ] | [X]JP2012110018 (KYOCERA CORP.) | [X]WO2010131540 (NEC CORP.) |