EP2940107 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING COAL BRIQUETTES, AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING SAID COAL BRIQUETTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Posco (Goedong-dong) 6261, Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 790-300 / KR | [2015/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEO, Nam-Hwan c/o Posco 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 790-300 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Jae-Hoon c/o Posco 6261 Donghaean-ro Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 790-300 / KR | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2019/10] |
Former [2015/45] | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13869240.5 | 16.12.2013 | [2015/45] | WO2013KR11666 | Priority number, date | KR20120155437 | 27.12.2012 Original published format: KR 20120155437 | [2015/45] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014104631 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2940107 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2940107 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C10L5/10, C21B13/00, C10L5/36, C21B13/14 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
C10L5/361 (EP);
C21B13/00 (KR);
C10L5/10 (EP,KR);
C21B13/002 (EP);
C21B13/0033 (EP);
C21B13/0046 (EP);
C21B13/143 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/45] | C10L5/10, C21B13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KOHLEBRIKETTS UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG DIESER KOHLEBRIKETTS | [2015/45] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING COAL BRIQUETTES, AND APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING SAID COAL BRIQUETTES | [2015/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE BRIQUETTES DE CHARBON ET APPAREIL POUR LA FABRICATION DESDITES BRIQUETTES DE CHARBON | [2015/45] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2015 | Translation filed | 23.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 21.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2013 | AL | 06.03.2019 | CY | 06.03.2019 | CZ | 06.03.2019 | DK | 06.03.2019 | EE | 06.03.2019 | ES | 06.03.2019 | FI | 06.03.2019 | HR | 06.03.2019 | IT | 06.03.2019 | LT | 06.03.2019 | LV | 06.03.2019 | MC | 06.03.2019 | MK | 06.03.2019 | MT | 06.03.2019 | NL | 06.03.2019 | PL | 06.03.2019 | RO | 06.03.2019 | RS | 06.03.2019 | SE | 06.03.2019 | SI | 06.03.2019 | SK | 06.03.2019 | SM | 06.03.2019 | TR | 06.03.2019 | BG | 06.06.2019 | NO | 06.06.2019 | GR | 07.06.2019 | IS | 06.07.2019 | PT | 06.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 16.12.2013 | |
AL | 06.03.2019 | ||
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
MT | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 16.12.2013 | |
AL | 06.03.2019 | ||
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CY | 06.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
MC | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
TR | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SI | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
DK | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
IS | 06.07.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
PL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
SM | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 06.03.2019 | |
CZ | 06.03.2019 | ||
EE | 06.03.2019 | ||
ES | 06.03.2019 | ||
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RO | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
SK | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 06.03.2019 | |
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 06.03.2019 | |
FI | 06.03.2019 | ||
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
HR | 06.03.2019 | ||
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
LV | 06.03.2019 | ||
NL | 06.03.2019 | ||
RS | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
BG | 06.06.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
GR | 07.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
SE | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 06.03.2019 | |
LT | 06.03.2019 | ||
NO | 06.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2005071119 (POSCO [KR], et al) [I] 1-10 * page 1, line 5 - line 11 * * page 4, line 25 - page 10, line 6 * * page 12, line 26 - page 16, line 1 *; | [I]JP4130826B (HYWOOD CO.,LTD, YASUJIMA:KK) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 2-5 *; | [A] - MCCARTNEY AND S ERGUN J T, "Optical properties of coals and graphite", vol. 641, (19110101), pages 1 - 54, BULLETIN BUREAU OF MINES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, US, URL: http://digital.library.unt.edu/ark:/67531/metadc12792/m2/1/high_res_d/Bulletin06 41.pdf, XP008180962 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]KR850000895B (TAE JIN FUEL IND CORP [KR]); | [A]KR20010067725 (EOM TAE IN [KR], et al); | [A]KR20050077103 (POSCO [KR]); | [X]JP4130826B (HYWOOD CO.,LTD, YASUJIMA:KK) |