EP2939062 - HEAD MOUNTED DISPLAY AND METHOD OF VIDEO COMMUNICATION USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2015/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Eunhyung Intellectual Property Center LG Electronics Inc. 16 Umyeon-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-724 / KR | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/45] | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13869770.1 | 05.03.2013 | [2015/45] | WO2013KR01770 | Priority number, date | KR20120156555 | 28.12.2012 Original published format: KR 20120156555 | US201313772597 | 21.02.2013 Original published format: US201313772597 | [2015/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014104473 | Date: | 03.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2939062 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/14, G02B27/01 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
H04N7/144 (EP,US);
H04N7/14 (KR);
G02B27/017 (EP,US);
G02B27/02 (KR);
G02B2027/0127 (EP,US);
G02B2027/0138 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/45] | G02B27/04, G02B27/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/45] | Title | German: | KOPFMONTIERTE ANZEIGE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VIDEOKOMMUNIKATION DAMIT | [2015/45] | English: | HEAD MOUNTED DISPLAY AND METHOD OF VIDEO COMMUNICATION USING THE SAME | [2015/45] | French: | AFFICHAGE PORTÉ SUR LA TÊTE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION VIDÉO UTILISANT LEDIT AFFICHAGE | [2015/45] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2015 | Search fee paid | 12.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/45] | 11.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.12.2020 | 01.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/07] | 11.10.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 03.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]KR20080013347 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,11,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0062]; figures 4-5 * [I] 3,5-10,13-15; | [A]US6563626 (IWASAKI TAKEO [JP]) [A] 1-6,11-15 * column 12, line 21 - column 16, line 10; figures 8-11 * * column 21, line 13 - line 28; figures 20-21 * | International search | [X]US6349001 (SPITZER MARK B [US]); | [Y]US2007064112 (CHATTING DAVID J [GB], et al); | [Y]US2012154509 (ERB PAUL ANDREW [CA]); | [A]US2012218301 (MILLER GREGORY D [US]); | [A]US5936610 (ENDO SHOZO [JP]) |