EP2934310 - OPTICAL COHERENCE TOMOGRAPHY SYSTEM THAT IS RECONFIGURABLE BETWEEN DIFFERENT IMAGING MODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kemp, Nathaniel J. 59 Mallard Drive Concord, MA 01742 / US | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13870040.6 | 16.12.2013 | [2015/44] | WO2013US75328 | Priority number, date | US201261740104P | 20.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261740104 P | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014107287 | Date: | 10.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2934310 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/026 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
G01B9/02091 (EP,US);
A61B5/0066 (EP,US);
G01B9/02004 (EP,US);
G01B9/02009 (EP,US);
G01B9/0203 (EP,US);
G01B9/02048 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] | Title | German: | OPTISCHES KOHÄRENZTOMOGRAFIESYSTEM ZWISCHEN VERSCHIEDENEN REKONFIGURIERBAREN BILDGEBUNGSMODI | [2015/44] | English: | OPTICAL COHERENCE TOMOGRAPHY SYSTEM THAT IS RECONFIGURABLE BETWEEN DIFFERENT IMAGING MODES | [2015/44] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TOMOGRAPHIE EN COHÉRENCE OPTIQUE RECONFIGURABLE ENTRE DIFFÉRENTS MODES D'IMAGERIE | [2015/44] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 09.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.12.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2012098194 (ZEISS CARL MEDITEC AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8 * the whole document * [Y] 9-11; | [XY]US2010110376 (EVERETT MATTHEW J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8 * the whole document * [Y] 9-11; | [Y]US2012310081 (ADLER DESMOND [US], et al) [Y] 9-11 * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0146] *; | [Y]US2003216621 (ALPERT HOWARD DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 9-11 * paragraph [0033] - paragraphs [0048] , [0093] *; | [AD]WO2009009801 (VOLCANO CORP [US], et al) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2012220836 (ALPERT HOWARD DAVID [US], et al); | [Y]US2010272432 (JOHNSON BARTLEY C [US]); | [Y]WO2012098194 (ZEISS CARL MEDITEC AG [DE], et al); | [A]US2012062843 (FERGUSON R DANIEL [US], et al) | by applicant | WO2012098194 | US2010110376 | US2012310081 | US2003216621 | US8108030 | US2011152771 | US2010220334 | US2009043191 | US2008291463 | US2008180683 | US8049900 | US7929148 | US7853316 | US7711413 | US2012224751 | US2012136259 | US2012013914 | US2009046295 | US7783337 | US6134003 | US6421164 | US7999938 | US7995210 | US7787127 | US2007015969 | US2009018393 | WO2004096049 | US2007161893 | US2009093980 | US2008097194 | US2007038121 | US6396976 | US6212308 | US4948229 | US5037169 | US5319492 | US6922498 | US7027211 | US2003050871 | US6954737 | US2006267756 | - B. BOUMA et al., Optics Letters, (19990000), vol. 24, pages 531 - 533 | - VAKHTIN et al., Applied Optics, (20030000), vol. 42, no. 34, pages 6953 - 6958 | - OKUNO et al., NTT Technical Review, (20030000), vol. 1, no. 7, pages 20 - 30 | US20070446683 | US19460609325 | US20080131825 | US20110609495 | US20080172922 | WO2004US12773 | US20090551684 | US20070868334 | US20090550771 | US20070441824 |