EP2948870 - VECTOR EXCEPTION CODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, New York 10504 / US | [2015/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRADBURY, Jonathan, David IBM Corporation 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, New York 12601-5400 / US | 02 /
SCHWARZ, Eric, Mark IBM Corporation M/P BLDG 705 FLOOR 2 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, New York 12601-5400 / US | 03 /
SLEGEL, Timothy IBM Corporation M/P MS-P310 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, New York 12601-5400 / US | 04 /
GSCHWIND, Michael, Karl IBM Corporation 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, New York 12601-5400 / US | [2015/49] | Representative(s) | Fournier, Kevin IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [2015/49] | Application number, filing date | 13872480.2 | 06.12.2013 | [2015/49] | WO2013IB60697 | Priority number, date | US201313748504 | 23.01.2013 Original published format: US201313748504 | [2015/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014115002 | Date: | 31.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2948870 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/16, G06F9/30, G06F9/38 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
G06F9/30036 (EP,US);
G06F9/30038 (EP,US);
G06F9/30098 (US);
G06F9/323 (EP,US);
G06F9/3861 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/49] | G06F17/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] | Title | German: | VEKTORAUSNAHMECODE | [2015/49] | English: | VECTOR EXCEPTION CODE | [2015/49] | French: | CODE D'EXCEPTION VECTORIELLE | [2015/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 08.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0141232 (IBM [US]); | [X]EP0335514 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) | International search | [X]US4777593 (YOSHIDA YAOKO [JP]); | [A]US5043867 (BHANDARKAR DILEEP P [US], et al); | [A]US2011047358 (EICHENBERGER ALEXANDRE E [US], et al) |