EP2956634 - COMPLIANT HEAT SHIELD LINER HANGER ASSEMBLY FOR GAS TURBINE ENGINES AND MOUNTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/52] | COMPLIANT HEAT SHIELD LINER HANGER ASSEMBLY FOR GAS TURBINE ENGINES | ||
[2018/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2016/43] |
Former [2015/52] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRESTON, Lon, H. 7960 SE Woodview Terr 4 Hobe Sound, FL 33455 / US | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | Dehns St. Brides House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2015/52] | Stevens, Jason Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13874990.8 | 13.12.2013 | [2015/52] | WO2013US75026 | Priority number, date | US201361764587P | 14.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361764587 P | [2015/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014126641 | Date: | 21.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2956634 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2956634 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/24, F01D25/00, F02C7/00, F23R3/00 | [2018/17] | CPC: |
F01D25/28 (EP,US);
B23P15/00 (US);
F02C7/20 (US);
F02K1/80 (EP,US);
F02K1/82 (US);
F02K1/822 (EP,US);
F02K9/34 (US);
F02K9/343 (US);
F02K9/346 (US);
F23R3/005 (US);
F23R3/60 (US);
F05D2230/642 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/52] | F01D25/24, F01D25/00, F02C7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLEXIBLE HITZESCHILDAUSKLEIDUNGSAUFHÄNGERANORDNUNG FÜR GASTURBINENMOTOREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEFESTIGUNG | [2018/17] | English: | COMPLIANT HEAT SHIELD LINER HANGER ASSEMBLY FOR GAS TURBINE ENGINES AND MOUNTING METHOD | [2018/17] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE FIXATION D'ÉCRAN THERMIQUE FLEXIBLE DE LINER POUR UNE TURBINE À GAZ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FIXATION | [2018/18] |
Former [2015/52] | FLEXIBLE HITZESCHILDAUSKLEIDUNGSAUFHÄNGERANORDNUNG FÜR GASTURBINENMOTOREN | ||
Former [2015/52] | COMPLIANT HEAT SHIELD LINER HANGER ASSEMBLY FOR GAS TURBINE ENGINES | ||
Former [2015/52] | ENSEMBLE SUPPORT DE CHEMISE DE PROTECTION THERMIQUE ADAPTATIF DESTINÉ À DES MOTEURS DE TURBINE À GAZ | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/52] | 20.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2013 | AL | 17.10.2018 | AT | 17.10.2018 | CY | 17.10.2018 | CZ | 17.10.2018 | DK | 17.10.2018 | EE | 17.10.2018 | ES | 17.10.2018 | FI | 17.10.2018 | HR | 17.10.2018 | IT | 17.10.2018 | LT | 17.10.2018 | LV | 17.10.2018 | MC | 17.10.2018 | MK | 17.10.2018 | NL | 17.10.2018 | PL | 17.10.2018 | RO | 17.10.2018 | RS | 17.10.2018 | SE | 17.10.2018 | SI | 17.10.2018 | SK | 17.10.2018 | SM | 17.10.2018 | TR | 17.10.2018 | IE | 13.12.2018 | LU | 13.12.2018 | MT | 13.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | BG | 17.01.2019 | NO | 17.01.2019 | GR | 18.01.2019 | IS | 17.02.2019 | PT | 17.02.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
MT | 13.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
MT | 13.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.12.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.12.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
IT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
ES | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 17.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007151229 (FARAH JORGE I [US], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * paragraph [0022]; figures 3-5 *; | [X]US2007158527 (FARAH JORGE I [US], et al) [X] 1,8,14 * paragraphs [0020] , [0031] , [0032]; figures 3-5 *; | [X]US2009293498 (PETTY DALE WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1,2,14,15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0027]; figure 4 *; | [X]US2009317175 (MARTINEZ GONZALO F [US]) [X] 1,8,9,14,15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0022]; figures 3-5 *; | [X]US7861535 (FIGUEROA CARLOS G [US], et al) [X] 1,14,15* column 6, lines 6-27; figures 3-6 * | International search | [X]US2009317175 (MARTINEZ GONZALO F [US]); | [Y]EP2541147 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [Y]US2007158527 (FARAH JORGE I [US], et al); | [A]US2009293498 (PETTY DALE WILLIAM [US], et al); | [A]US2002064455 (TOFFAN MICHAEL JAY [US], et al) | by applicant | US2009293498 |