EP2827614 - AUDIO PLAYING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/38] |
Former [2015/04] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Xi Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/04] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/04] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13876772.8 | 28.11.2013 | [2016/38] | WO2013CN88064 | Priority number, date | CN201310194267 | 22.05.2013 Original published format: CN201310194267 | [2015/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014187099 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2827614 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2827614 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.11.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04S7/00, H04S1/00, H04R3/12, H04R5/02, H04R5/04 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
H04R5/04 (EP,US);
H04S1/00 (US);
H04R2205/024 (EP,US);
H04R2420/03 (EP,US);
H04R2499/11 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/04] | H04S7/00, H04S1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUDIOWIEDERGABEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2015/08] | English: | AUDIO PLAYING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2015/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE LECTURE AUDIO | [2015/04] |
Former [2015/04] | AUDIOWIEDERGABEVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2014 | Translation filed | 11.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 28.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.11.2013 | AL | 21.09.2016 | AT | 21.09.2016 | BE | 21.09.2016 | CY | 21.09.2016 | CZ | 21.09.2016 | DK | 21.09.2016 | EE | 21.09.2016 | ES | 21.09.2016 | FI | 21.09.2016 | HR | 21.09.2016 | LT | 21.09.2016 | LV | 21.09.2016 | MC | 21.09.2016 | MK | 21.09.2016 | NL | 21.09.2016 | PL | 21.09.2016 | RO | 21.09.2016 | RS | 21.09.2016 | SE | 21.09.2016 | SI | 21.09.2016 | SK | 21.09.2016 | SM | 21.09.2016 | TR | 21.09.2016 | IE | 28.11.2016 | MT | 28.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | BG | 21.12.2016 | NO | 21.12.2016 | GR | 22.12.2016 | IS | 21.01.2017 | PT | 23.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 28.11.2013 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
TR | 21.09.2016 | ||
IE | 28.11.2016 | ||
MT | 28.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 28.11.2013 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
IE | 28.11.2016 | ||
MT | 28.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 28.11.2013 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
HR | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
IE | 28.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
IE | 28.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
ES | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
NL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 21.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007098191 (WAN TAI-SHING [TW], et al) [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * paragraphs [0003] , [00 4] , [0 30] - [0055]; claims 1, 13 *; | [XA]DE102011052098 (LOEWE OPTA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-7,10 * paragraphs [0033] - [0059]; figures 1,2,5; claim 1 * [A] 4,9; | [X]US2013038726 (KIM JIN-HYONG [KR]) [X] 1,2,5-7,10* paragraphs [0008] - [0014] - [0 91] - [0129]; figures 6-11; claims 1, 9 * | International search | [X]CN1979410 (GUANGDA COMP CO LTD [CN]); | [Y]CN102550047 (CYPRESS SEMICONDUCTOR CORP); | [X]CN102595304 (GUOGUANG ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al); | [A]CN202711124U (ACTION ASIA SHENZHEN CO LTD); | [X]DE102011052098 (LOEWE OPTA GMBH [DE]); | [X]US2013038726 (KIM JIN-HYONG [KR]); | [A]CN103000179 (CHINESE ACAD INST ACOUSTICS); | [XP]CN103295610 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) |