EP2973537 - DJ STEM SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beatport LLC 2399 Blake Street Suite 170 Denver, CO 80205 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SICILIANO, Michael, Peter c/o Beatport LLC 2399 Blake Street Suite 170 Denver, CO 80205 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Dodgson, Emily Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13877648.9 | 14.03.2013 | [2016/03] | WO2013US31756 | Priority number, date | US201313802548 | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US201313802548 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014142931 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2973537 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G10H7/02, G11B27/038, G11B27/10, G11B27/11 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
G11B27/038 (EP,US);
G10H1/0008 (US);
G11B27/005 (EP,US);
G11B27/036 (US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/32 (EP,US);
H04H60/04 (US);
H04S1/00 (US);
H04S1/007 (EP,US);
H04S7/00 (US);
G10H2210/061 (US);
G10H2210/125 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/48] | G10H7/02, G11B27/038 | ||
Former IPC [2016/03] | G10H7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM MISCHEN VON MUSIKSTÜCKEN | [2016/03] | English: | DJ STEM SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2016/03] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE STEM DE DISC-JOCKEY | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 12.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 28.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.01.2023 | 20.01.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/23] | 04.02.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/23] | Divisional application(s) | EP22215182.1 / EP4177888 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO03019560 (GRACENOTE INC [US]) [I] 1-13 * paragraphs [0032] - [0049] - [0066] - [0068] *; | [I] - Anonymous, "How Editing Works - MusicBrainz", (20130301), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20130301040814/http://beta.musicbrainz.org/doc/How_Editing_Works, (20161215), XP055329359 [I] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - Anonymous, "Editor - MusicBrainz", (20130301), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20130301042147/http://beta.musicbrainz.org/doc/Editor, (20161215), XP055329437 [A] 2,3,7,8 * the whole document * | [A] - SWARTZ A, "Musicbrainz: a semantic web service", IEEE INTELLIGENT SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20020101), vol. 17, no. 1, doi:10.1109/5254.988466, ISSN 1094-7167, pages 76 - 77, XP011094352 [A] 6,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/5254.988466 | International search | [A]US2010036759 (BEN-YAACOV YAACOV [US], et al); | [Y]US2010216547 (COPPARD NATHAN [GB], et al); | [A]US2011218983 (CHANEY JEREMY P [US], et al); | [Y]US2011231426 (FEJTA ERICK L [US], et al); | [Y]US2012308049 (SCHREINER STEPHAN [DE], et al) |