EP2996158 - SOLAR POWER SYSTEM, ABNORMALITY DETERMINATION PROCESSING DEVICE, ABNORMALITY DETERMINATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/11] | SOLAR POWER SYSTEM, ANOMALY DETERMINATION PROCESSING DEVICE, ANOMALY DETERMINATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | ||
[2018/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2016/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSURUTA Kosuke c/o OMRON Corporation 801 Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
NAKAI Takuya c/o OMRON Corporation 801 Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | Kilian Kilian & Partner mbB Zielstattstraße 23a 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/11] | Kilian Kilian & Partner Aidenbachstraße 54 81379 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13878113.3 | 16.08.2013 | [2016/11] | WO2013JP72002 | Priority number, date | JP20130052438 | 14.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013052438 | [2016/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014141498 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2996158 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2996158 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2996158 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/04, H01L31/042 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
H01L31/02021 (EP,US);
G06F30/20 (US);
H02S50/00 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SOLARENERGIESYSTEM, VERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR ABNORMALITÄTSBESTIMMUNG, VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR ABNORMALITÄTSBESTIMMUNG UND PROGRAMM | [2018/38] | English: | SOLAR POWER SYSTEM, ABNORMALITY DETERMINATION PROCESSING DEVICE, ABNORMALITY DETERMINATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2018/22] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE SOLAIRE, DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE DÉTERMINATION D'ANORMALlTÉ, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DÉTERMINATION D'ANORMALITÉ ET PROGRAMME | [2018/38] |
Former [2016/11] | SOLARENERGIESYSTEM, VERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR ANOMALIENBESTIMMUNG, VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR ANOMALIENBESTIMMUNG UND PROGRAMM | ||
Former [2016/11] | SOLAR POWER SYSTEM, ANOMALY DETERMINATION PROCESSING DEVICE, ANOMALY DETERMINATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | ||
Former [2016/11] | SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE SOLAIRE, DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE DÉTERMINATION D'ANOMALIE, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE DÉTERMINATION D'ANOMALIE, ET PROGRAMME | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2016 | Translation filed | 20.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2016 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/11] | 20.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2016/11] | 20.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 23.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 30.07.2018 | Request for correction of the decision to grant filed | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 20.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 20.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 20.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 20.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2016 | Decision despatched | 20.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 20.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 20.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 20.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 20.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 20.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2016 | Decision despatched | 20.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 20.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 20.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 20.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 14.10.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.01.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.08.2013 | AL | 30.05.2018 | AT | 30.05.2018 | CY | 30.05.2018 | CZ | 30.05.2018 | DK | 30.05.2018 | EE | 30.05.2018 | ES | 30.05.2018 | FI | 30.05.2018 | HR | 30.05.2018 | IT | 30.05.2018 | LT | 30.05.2018 | LV | 30.05.2018 | MC | 30.05.2018 | MK | 30.05.2018 | NL | 30.05.2018 | PL | 30.05.2018 | PT | 30.05.2018 | RO | 30.05.2018 | RS | 30.05.2018 | SE | 30.05.2018 | SI | 30.05.2018 | SK | 30.05.2018 | SM | 30.05.2018 | TR | 30.05.2018 | IE | 16.08.2018 | LU | 16.08.2018 | MT | 16.08.2018 | BG | 30.08.2018 | GB | 30.08.2018 | NO | 30.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | FR | 31.08.2018 | GR | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | IS | 30.09.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 16.08.2013 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MK | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 16.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.08.2018 | ||
MT | 16.08.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GB | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 16.08.2013 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 16.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.08.2018 | ||
MT | 16.08.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GB | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 16.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.08.2018 | ||
MT | 16.08.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GB | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 16.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.08.2018 | ||
MT | 16.08.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GB | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 16.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.08.2018 | ||
MT | 16.08.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GB | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 16.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.08.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GB | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 16.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.08.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
GB | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 16.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.08.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 16.08.2018 | ||
LU | 16.08.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
LU | 16.08.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
LU | 16.08.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
SE | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011307199 (KLEIN JENS [DE], et al) [X] 1-7* page 4750; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2012323507 (HASEGAWA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0050] - [0140]; figures 1-3,6b,7a,23a,23b * | International search | [Y]JP2011216811 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2012055090 (NTT FACILITIES INC); | [Y]JP2012156343 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2012169447 (TABUCHI DENKI KK) | by applicant | JP2011181614 |