EP2977326 - ADHESIVE TAPE CARTON SEALING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Su-Zhou Xuenuo Mechanical Products Co., Ltd Gu Pu Road Industry Park Chengxiang Town Taicang, Jiangsu 215400 / CN | [2016/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Qicang Gu Pu Road Industry Park Chengxiang Town Taicang Jiangsu 215400 / CN | [2016/04] | Representative(s) | Baker, Thomas Edward Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/27] | Baker, Thomas Edward Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | ||
Former [2016/04] | Baker, Thomas Edward Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 7th Floor Churchill House Churchill Way, Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 13878710.6 | 17.04.2013 | [2016/04] | WO2013CN74297 | Priority number, date | CN20131086919 | 19.03.2013 Original published format: CN201310086919 | [2016/04] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014146315 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2977326 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2977326 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65B51/06, B65B59/04 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
B65B51/067 (EP,US);
B31B50/72 (US);
B31B50/722 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/47] | B65B51/06, B31B1/72, B65B59/04 | ||
Former IPC [2016/04] | B65B51/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEBEBAND-KARTONVERSCHLIESSMASCHINEN | [2016/04] | English: | ADHESIVE TAPE CARTON SEALING MACHINE | [2016/04] | French: | MACHINE DE SCELLEMENT DE CARTON À RUBAN ADHÉSIF | [2016/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2015 | Translation filed | 17.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 17.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 23.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2013 | AL | 03.07.2019 | AT | 03.07.2019 | CY | 03.07.2019 | CZ | 03.07.2019 | DK | 03.07.2019 | EE | 03.07.2019 | FI | 03.07.2019 | HR | 03.07.2019 | LT | 03.07.2019 | LV | 03.07.2019 | MC | 03.07.2019 | MK | 03.07.2019 | MT | 03.07.2019 | NL | 03.07.2019 | PL | 03.07.2019 | RO | 03.07.2019 | RS | 03.07.2019 | SE | 03.07.2019 | SI | 03.07.2019 | SK | 03.07.2019 | SM | 03.07.2019 | TR | 03.07.2019 | NO | 03.10.2019 | GR | 04.10.2019 | IS | 03.11.2019 | PT | 04.11.2019 | LU | 17.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.04.2013 | |
AL | 03.07.2019 | ||
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
MT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
LU | 17.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
LU | 17.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 03.07.2019 | |
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 03.07.2019 | |
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 03.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29722527U (KALLFASS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]US5916106 (CHEN TUAN-MEI CHIU [TW]) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 57 - column 3, line 58 * * column 4, line 13 - column 4, line 21 * * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 10 * * figures 1,6,9 *; | [IA]US6135937 (BALLOS III PETE [US]) [I] 1-3,5,6 * column 1, line 5 - column 1, line 15 * * column 5, line 47 - column 2, line 20 * * column 6, line 33 - column 7, line 12 * * figures 1-10 * [A] 4,7; | [A]EP1571087 (SCHMETZER HELMUT [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009064636 (CHU WILLIAM YIU TONG [CA]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2000203528 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [Y]US2002005258 (TSUKEN TADAAKI [JP], et al); | [A]CN201211931Y (NENGWEN CHEN [CN]); | [YP]CN102975899 (GUANGDONG JIDIAN POLYTECHNIC); | [E]CN203127212U (SUZHOU XUENUO MECHANICAL PRODUCTS CO LTD) |