EP2979761 - METHOD FOR REGENERATING DENITRIFICATION CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Chugoku Electric Power Co., Inc. 4-33 Komachi Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 730-8701 / JP | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIKAWA, Toshikazu c/o THE CHUGOKU ELECTRIC POWER CO. INC. 4-33 Komachi Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 730-8701 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA, Kazuhiro c/o THE CHUGOKU ELECTRIC POWER CO. INC. 4-33 Komachi Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 730-8701 / JP | 03 /
SHIMADA, Hiroshi c/o THE CHUGOKU ELECTRIC POWER CO. INC. 4-33 Komachi Naka-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 730-8701 / JP | 04 /
NOBORI, Misao c/o HIDAKA SANGYO CO. LTD. 4-18 Ebie 5-chome Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 553-0001 / JP | 05 /
ITO, Atsushi 16-5 Aza Hongo Higashi-Itsushiro Ichinomiya-shi Aichi 494-0008 / JP | 06 /
MIYAKE, Fumihiro c/o HIDAKA FINE-TECHNOLOGIES CO. LTD. 22-2 Ebie 7-chome Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 553-0001 / JP | 07 /
MORIZANE, Yuichiro c/o HIDAKA FINE-TECHNOLOGIES CO. LTD. 22-2 Ebie 7-chome Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 553-0001 / JP | 08 /
KAGAWA, Hiroyuki c/o HIDAKA FINE-TECHNOLOGIES CO. LTD. 22-2 Ebie 7-chome Fukushima-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 553-0001 / JP | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2016/05] | Application number, filing date | 13880088.3 | 28.03.2013 | [2016/05] | WO2013JP59382 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014155628 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2979761 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01J38/00, B01J8/08, B01J19/24, B24C3/32 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
B01J38/00 (EP,US);
B01D53/9409 (EP,US);
B01D53/96 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (US);
B24C3/065 (EP,US);
B24C3/327 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/05] | B01J38/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REGENERIERUNG EINES DENITRIFIKATIONSKATALYSATORS | [2016/05] | English: | METHOD FOR REGENERATING DENITRIFICATION CATALYST | [2016/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT LA RÉGÉNÉRATION D'UN CATALYSEUR DE DÉNITRIFICATION | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2015 | Translation filed | 20.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 25.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/02] | 28.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US4102980 (SASAKI TAKASHI, et al) [I] 1,3,4 * abstract * * column 3, lines 51-54 * * figures 1,2 * * column 4, lines 5-13,62-68 * * column 5, lines 1-4,19-34 * [Y] 2; | [YA]EP0241310 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 2 * the whole document * * page 5, line 31 - page 6, line 15 * * page 4, lines 43-64 * * figures 3-5,7 * [A] 1,3,4; | [YA]JPH02245241 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [Y] 2 * the whole document * * abstract *[A] 1,3,4; | [XYI]JP2012000693 (HIDAKA FINE TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD) [X] 1,4 * the whole document * * page 58 * * abstract * * paragraph [0058] * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 2 [I] 3 | International search | [A]JPS62241555 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JPH07116523 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND); | [A]JP2000325801 (SHIKOKU ELEC POWER, et al) | by applicant | JPH01119343 | JPH04197451 | JPH07116523 |