EP2896707 - ALUMINUM ALLOY CONDUCTOR, ALUMINUM ALLOY TWISTED WIRE, COATED ELECTRIC WIRE, WIRE HARNESS, AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR ALUMINUM ALLOY CONDUCTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | For all designated states Furukawa Automotive Systems Inc. 1000 Amago Kora-cho Inukami-gun Shiga 522-0242 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | ||
For all designated states Furukawa Automotive Systems Inc. 1000 Amago Kora-cho Inukami-gun Shiga 522-0242 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEKIYA Shigeki c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIDA Sho c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 03 /
SUSAI Kyota c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 04 /
MITOSE Kengo c/o FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 2-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2018/46] |
Former [2015/30] | Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13880474.5 | 15.11.2013 | [2018/46] | WO2013JP80956 | Priority number, date | JP20130075404 | 29.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013075404 | [2015/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014155818 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2896707 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2896707 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C22C21/08, C22F1/05, H01B1/02, H01B5/02, H01B5/08, H01B7/00, H01B13/00, C22F1/00 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
H01B1/023 (EP,US);
C22C21/00 (US);
C22C21/02 (EP,US);
C22C21/04 (US);
C22C21/08 (EP,US);
C22C21/14 (US);
C22C21/16 (US);
C22F1/00 (EP,US);
C22F1/04 (EP,US);
C22F1/043 (EP,US);
C22F1/047 (EP,US);
C22F1/05 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/30] | C22C21/00, C22F1/04, H01B1/02, H01B5/02, H01B5/08, H01B7/00, H01B13/00, C22F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGSLEITER, VERDRILLTER ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGSDRAHT, BESCHICHTETER ELEKTRODRAHT, KABELBAUM UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DEN ALUMINIUMLEGIERUNGSLEITER | [2015/30] | English: | ALUMINUM ALLOY CONDUCTOR, ALUMINUM ALLOY TWISTED WIRE, COATED ELECTRIC WIRE, WIRE HARNESS, AND PRODUCTION METHOD FOR ALUMINUM ALLOY CONDUCTOR | [2015/30] | French: | CONDUCTEUR EN ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM, FIL TORSADÉ EN ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM, FIL ÉLECTRIQUE REVÊTU, FAISCEAU DE FILS ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION POUR CONDUCTEURS EN ALLIAGE D'ALUMINIUM | [2015/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2015 | Translation filed | 15.04.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 05.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.05.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2013 | AL | 14.11.2018 | AT | 14.11.2018 | CY | 14.11.2018 | CZ | 14.11.2018 | DK | 14.11.2018 | EE | 14.11.2018 | ES | 14.11.2018 | FI | 14.11.2018 | HR | 14.11.2018 | IT | 14.11.2018 | LT | 14.11.2018 | LV | 14.11.2018 | MC | 14.11.2018 | MK | 14.11.2018 | NL | 14.11.2018 | PL | 14.11.2018 | RO | 14.11.2018 | RS | 14.11.2018 | SE | 14.11.2018 | SI | 14.11.2018 | SK | 14.11.2018 | SM | 14.11.2018 | TR | 14.11.2018 | IE | 15.11.2018 | LU | 15.11.2018 | MT | 15.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | FR | 14.01.2019 | BG | 14.02.2019 | GB | 14.02.2019 | NO | 14.02.2019 | GR | 15.02.2019 | IS | 14.03.2019 | PT | 14.03.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 15.11.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
MT | 15.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GB | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 15.11.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
MT | 15.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
GB | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 15.11.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
MT | 15.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 15.11.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 15.11.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 14.01.2019 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
IE | 15.11.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
IT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
AT | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
SE | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 14.11.2018 | |
NO | 14.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010071933 (OTSUKA YASUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * claim 2; table 1 *; | [X]US4042424 (NICOUD JEAN-CLAUDE) [X] 1-10 * examples 1-8 * | International search | JP2012229485 [ ] | JP2003105473 [ ] | [A]JP2013044040 (THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) | [A]JPS5947365 (THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) | Examination | EP2896707 | US4042424 | - Mondolfo, L. F., Aluminum Alloys: Structure and Properties, London, Butterworths & Co Ltd, (19760101), page 788,793, ISBN 0-408-70680-5 |