EP2979499 - CONTROL OF WLAN SELECTION POLICIES IN ROAMING SCENARIOS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel IP Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUPTA, Vivek G. 4945 Bridgeview Lane San Jose, California 95138 / US | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2018/05] |
Former [2016/05] | Goddar, Heinz J. BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13880623.7 | 26.12.2013 | [2016/05] | WO2013US77764 | Priority number, date | US201361806821P | 29.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361806821 P | [2016/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014158274 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2979499 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2979499 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/20 | [2017/37] | CPC: |
H04B7/0452 (EP,US);
H04W24/10 (KR);
H04L1/1864 (EP,CN,US);
H04W8/082 (US);
H04B1/56 (US);
H04B7/0417 (US);
H04B7/0617 (EP,US);
H04B7/0619 (US);
H04B7/063 (EP,US);
H04B7/0695 (EP,US);
H04B7/088 (EP,US);
H04L25/0204 (US);
H04L25/03305 (US);
H04L47/803 (EP,US);
H04L47/83 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (US);
H04L5/0051 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0057 (CN,US);
H04L5/0085 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/1469 (EP);
H04L65/613 (EP,US);
H04L65/65 (US);
H04L65/70 (EP,US);
H04L65/75 (US);
H04L65/752 (EP);
H04L65/756 (EP);
H04L65/762 (EP,US);
H04L65/764 (EP,US);
H04L65/80 (EP,US);
H04M1/72457 (US);
H04N21/2402 (EP,US);
H04N21/8456 (EP,US);
H04N21/8543 (EP,US);
H04W24/00 (US);
H04W24/02 (US);
H04W24/04 (KR);
H04W28/02 (EP,US);
H04W28/0226 (US);
H04W28/0289 (US);
H04W28/20 (US);
H04W36/0011 (EP,US);
H04W36/0022 (EP,US);
H04W36/125 (EP,US);
H04W36/22 (KR,US);
H04W36/26 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W4/021 (EP,US);
H04W48/06 (US);
H04W48/16 (US);
H04W48/18 (EP,CN,US);
H04W56/001 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/541 (US);
H04W76/15 (US);
H04W8/02 (US);
H04W8/06 (US);
H04L2025/03426 (EP,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0055 (EP);
H04W28/082 (US);
H04W36/0072 (EP,US);
H04W36/08 (CN,US);
H04W48/12 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/046 (US);
H04W84/042 (US);
H04W84/045 (US);
H04W84/12 (US);
H04W88/02 (US);
H04W88/08 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/48] | H04W48/14, H04W48/16, H04W88/14 | ||
Former IPC [2016/05] | H04W48/18, H04W88/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNG DER RICHTLINIEN FÜR WLAN-AUSWAHL IN ROAMING-SZENARIEN | [2016/05] | English: | CONTROL OF WLAN SELECTION POLICIES IN ROAMING SCENARIOS | [2016/05] | French: | GESTION DE POLITIQUES DE SÉLECTION DE WLAN DANS DES SCÉNARIOS D'ITINÉRANCE | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 26.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 31.01.2018 | CY | 31.01.2018 | CZ | 31.01.2018 | DK | 31.01.2018 | FI | 31.01.2018 | HR | 31.01.2018 | IT | 31.01.2018 | LT | 31.01.2018 | LV | 31.01.2018 | MC | 31.01.2018 | MK | 31.01.2018 | PL | 31.01.2018 | PT | 31.01.2018 | RO | 31.01.2018 | RS | 31.01.2018 | SE | 31.01.2018 | SI | 31.01.2018 | SM | 31.01.2018 | TR | 31.01.2018 | BG | 30.04.2018 | NO | 30.04.2018 | IS | 31.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
IT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009127238 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-15* page 3, line 10 - line 30 *; | [A]WO2011050835 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 5, line 5 - page 7, line 15; figure 6 *; | [IY]WO2012090401 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058]; figure 9; claim 1 * * paragraph [0067] * [Y] 11-15; | [Y]US2013005332 (SEDLACEK IVO [SE], et al) [Y] 11-15 * paragraph [0005] *; | [A]WO2013042330 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0027] * | International search | [A]US2010208698 (LU GUANG [CA], et al); | [A]US2011188376 (STUPAR PATRICK [DE], et al); | [A]WO2012138091 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | [A]US2013012182 (LIAO CHING-YU [TW]) |