EP2978787 - RIGID POLYURETHANE FOAMS WITH HIGH ACOUSTIC ABSORPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | For all designated states Bayer Materialscience (China) Co., Ltd. 82 Muhua Road Shanghai Chemical Industry Park Caojing Shanghai 201507 / CN | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOHNKE, Lutz Obstgarten 8 51491 Overath / DE | 02 /
BEAUJEAN, Joern Bergische Landstrabe 184 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
ALBACH, Rolf Hufelandstrabe 69 51061 Koln / DE | 04 /
LI, Jun Room 402, No. 7 Lane 197, Yangxin Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 200126 / CN | 05 /
SHI, Ling Room 401, No. 21 Lane 176, Mintong Road Pudong Shanghai 201209 / CN | [2016/10] |
Former [2016/05] | 01 /
BOHNKE, Lutz Obstgarten 8 51491 Overath / DE | ||
02 /
BEAUJEAN, Joern Bergische Landstrabe 184 51375 Leverkusen / DE | |||
03 /
ALBACH, Rolf Hufelandstrabe 69 51061 Koln / DE | |||
04 /
LI, Jun 197 Yangxin Road Pudong Shanghai 200126 / CN | |||
05 /
SHI, Ling 176 Min Tong Road Pudong Shanghai 201209 / CN | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/05] | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 13880683.1 | 25.03.2013 | [2016/05] | WO2013CN73114 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014153701 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2978787 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 02.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/40, C08G18/48, C08G18/74, C08G18/76, C08J9/04, C08J9/06, C08J9/08 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
C08G18/7671 (EP,US);
C08G18/3206 (EP,US);
C08G18/4816 (EP,US);
C08G18/4825 (EP,US);
C08G18/4837 (EP,US);
C08G18/485 (US);
C08G18/6677 (EP,US);
C08G18/7664 (EP,US);
C08J9/02 (EP,US);
C08G18/4804 (US);
C08G18/4812 (US);
C08G2110/0025 (US);
C08G2350/00 (EP,US);
C08J2201/022 (EP,US);
C08J2205/05 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Title | German: | POLYURETHAN-HARTSCHAUMSTOFFE MIT HOHER SCHALLDÄMPFUNG | [2016/05] | English: | RIGID POLYURETHANE FOAMS WITH HIGH ACOUSTIC ABSORPTION | [2016/05] | French: | MOUSSES DE POLYURÉTHANE RIGIDES PRÉSENTANT UNE FORTE ABSORPTION ACOUSTIQUE | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 18.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 30.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006142407 (HOLLMANN CHRISTOPH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-9 * claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0339369 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [Y] 1-9 * example 3; claim 1 * | International search | [A]US2006142407 (HOLLMANN CHRISTOPH [DE], et al); | [A]US4863976 (NICHOLS JERRAM B [US], et al); | [A]CN102093527B (SHANGHAI DONGDA POLYURETHANE CO LTD); | [A]CN101848955 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC) |