EP2982401 - DRUG INJECTION SYRINGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2016/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWASE, Yoichiro c/o Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 1500 Inokuchi Nakai-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 259-0151 / JP | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2016/06] | Application number, filing date | 13880969.4 | 05.04.2013 | [2016/06] | WO2013JP60433 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014162585 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2982401 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2982401 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/32, A61M5/28, A61M5/31, A61M5/34, A61M5/46 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
A61M5/345 (EP,US);
A61M5/31 (US);
A61M5/3293 (EP,US);
A61M5/347 (EP,US);
A61M5/46 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3101 (US);
A61M5/349 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/06] | A61M5/32, A61M5/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIRKSTOFFINJEKTIONSSPRITZE | [2016/06] | English: | DRUG INJECTION SYRINGE | [2016/06] | French: | SERINGUE POUR MÉDICAMENT LIQUIDE | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2015 | Translation filed | 28.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 29.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.04.2013 | AL | 25.03.2020 | AT | 25.03.2020 | CY | 25.03.2020 | CZ | 25.03.2020 | DK | 25.03.2020 | EE | 25.03.2020 | ES | 25.03.2020 | FI | 25.03.2020 | HR | 25.03.2020 | IT | 25.03.2020 | LT | 25.03.2020 | LV | 25.03.2020 | MC | 25.03.2020 | MK | 25.03.2020 | MT | 25.03.2020 | NL | 25.03.2020 | PL | 25.03.2020 | RO | 25.03.2020 | RS | 25.03.2020 | SE | 25.03.2020 | SI | 25.03.2020 | SK | 25.03.2020 | SM | 25.03.2020 | TR | 25.03.2020 | IE | 05.04.2020 | LU | 05.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | BG | 25.06.2020 | NO | 25.06.2020 | GR | 26.06.2020 | IS | 25.07.2020 | PT | 18.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 05.04.2013 | |
AL | 25.03.2020 | ||
AT | 25.03.2020 | ||
CY | 25.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
MT | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 05.04.2020 | ||
LU | 05.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 05.04.2013 | |
AT | 25.03.2020 | ||
CY | 25.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
MT | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 05.04.2020 | ||
LU | 05.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 05.04.2020 | ||
LU | 05.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 05.04.2020 | ||
LU | 05.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 05.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 05.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 05.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
NO | 25.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4187848 (TAYLOR GLENN N [US]) [Y] 2,3 * figures 3-6 *; | [Y]US5964737 (CAIZZA RICHARD J [US]) [Y] 2,3 * figures 4-11 *; | [A]JP2002177387 (TERUMO CORP) [A] 1-9* figures 1-12 *; | [XI]US2011077602 (YOKOTA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0092]; figures 1-9 * [I] 8; | [Y]WO2011125561 (TERUMO CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3 * figures 1, 2, 4-6 *; | [XYI]WO2012157318 (TERUMO CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9 * Abstract; passages relating to the elastic body 61 and fitting of the distal end 52a of the drug discharging tube 52, particularly paragraphs [0072]-[0074];; figures 1-5 * [Y] 2,3 [I] 8 | International search | [Y]US5964737 (CAIZZA RICHARD J [US]); | [Y]WO2012157318 (TERUMO CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2011212185 |