EP2988031 - ENGAGEMENT DEVICE AND POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBATA, Hiroyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
KOMADA, Hideaki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
SHIOIRI, Hiroyuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
MIYAKE, Kouhei c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 05 /
KATO, Shotaro c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2018/06] |
Former [2016/08] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13882114.5 | 16.04.2013 | [2016/08] | WO2013JP61330 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014170966 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2988031 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2988031 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/387, B60K6/445, B60W10/02, B60W10/08, F16H61/04 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
B60K6/383 (EP,US);
B60W20/40 (US);
B60K6/387 (EP,US);
B60K6/445 (EP,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
F16D11/14 (US);
F16H61/04 (EP,US);
B60Y2400/421 (EP,US);
B60Y2400/427 (EP,US);
F16H2061/044 (EP,US);
F16H2061/0474 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/08] | F16H61/02, B60K6/26, B60K6/383, B60K6/387, B60K6/40, B60K6/445, F16H63/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRASTVORRICHTUNG UND LEISTUNGSÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/08] | English: | ENGAGEMENT DEVICE AND POWER TRANSMISSION DEVICE | [2016/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN PRISE ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE PUISSANCE | [2016/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2015 | Translation filed | 12.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 24.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.04.2013 | AL | 07.02.2018 | AT | 07.02.2018 | CY | 07.02.2018 | CZ | 07.02.2018 | DK | 07.02.2018 | EE | 07.02.2018 | ES | 07.02.2018 | FI | 07.02.2018 | HR | 07.02.2018 | IT | 07.02.2018 | LT | 07.02.2018 | LV | 07.02.2018 | MC | 07.02.2018 | MK | 07.02.2018 | NL | 07.02.2018 | PL | 07.02.2018 | PT | 07.02.2018 | RO | 07.02.2018 | RS | 07.02.2018 | SE | 07.02.2018 | SI | 07.02.2018 | SK | 07.02.2018 | SM | 07.02.2018 | TR | 07.02.2018 | IE | 16.04.2018 | LU | 16.04.2018 | MT | 16.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | BG | 07.05.2018 | GB | 07.05.2018 | NO | 07.05.2018 | GR | 08.05.2018 | IS | 07.06.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 16.04.2013 | |
AL | 07.02.2018 | ||
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PT | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
TR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IE | 16.04.2018 | ||
LU | 16.04.2018 | ||
MT | 16.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GB | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PT | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
TR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IE | 16.04.2018 | ||
LU | 16.04.2018 | ||
MT | 16.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GB | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
TR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IE | 16.04.2018 | ||
LU | 16.04.2018 | ||
MT | 16.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GB | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
IE | 16.04.2018 | ||
LU | 16.04.2018 | ||
MT | 16.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GB | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
IE | 16.04.2018 | ||
LU | 16.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GB | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
IE | 16.04.2018 | ||
LU | 16.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
LU | 16.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
LU | 16.04.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2466318 (KOHR ROBERT F) [X] 1-3,5 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 1; figure . *[A] 4; | [XA]US2011079097 (CAVALLINO CARLO [IT]) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document * [A] 4,6 | International search | [A]JP2003011682 (HITACHI UNISIA AUTOMOTIVE LTD); | [A]JP2005008005 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2006038136 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2006083919 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2010036880 (AISIN AW CO); | [A]JP2010070160 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]WO2010122664 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2011088319 (MEANS IND INC [US], et al) | by applicant | JP2010065804 |