EP2986617 - ANTI-BACTERIAL SIDEROPHORE-AMINOPENICILLIN CONJUGATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Notre Dame du Lac 940 Grace Hall Notre Dame, Indiana 46556-5612 / US | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Marvin, J. 17885 Tally Ho Drive South Bend, IN 46635 / US | 02 /
JI, Cheng 316 E. 66th Street Apt. 4b New York, NY 10065 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Patricia, A. 17885 Tally Ho Drive South Bend, IN 46635 / US | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | Hally, Anna-Louise FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 13882608.6 | 23.10.2013 | [2016/08] | WO2013US66408 | Priority number, date | US201313865801 | 18.04.2013 Original published format: US201313865801 | [2016/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014171971 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2986617 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 23.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D499/21, C07D499/68, A61K31/43, A61P31/04, A61K38/12, A61K31/133, A61K31/165, A61K31/40, A61K31/405, A61K31/407, A61K31/4196, A61K31/42, A61K31/427, A61K31/439, A61K31/4409, A61K31/4439, A61K31/496, A61K31/545, A61K31/63, A61K31/635, A61K31/65 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/235 (EP,US);
A61K31/133 (EP,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/405 (EP,US);
A61K31/407 (EP,US);
A61K31/4196 (EP,US);
A61K31/42 (EP,US);
A61K31/427 (EP,US);
A61K31/43 (EP,US);
A61K31/439 (EP,US);
A61K31/4409 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/545 (EP,US);
A61K31/63 (EP,US);
A61K31/635 (EP,US);
A61K31/65 (EP,US);
A61K31/702 (EP,US);
A61K31/7024 (EP,US);
A61K31/7036 (EP,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K31/7048 (EP,US);
A61K31/7056 (EP,US);
A61K47/547 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/08] | C07D499/21, C07D499/68, A61K31/43, A61P31/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Title | German: | ANTIBAKTERIELLE SIDEROPHOR-AMINOPENICILLIN-KONJUGATE | [2016/08] | English: | ANTI-BACTERIAL SIDEROPHORE-AMINOPENICILLIN CONJUGATES | [2016/08] | French: | CONJUGUÉS SIDÉROPHORE-AMINOPÉNICILLINE ANTIBACTÉRIENS | [2016/08] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 07.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - CHENG JI ET AL, "Iron Transport-Mediated Drug Delivery: Practical Syntheses and In Vitro Antibacterial Studies of Tris-Catecholate Siderophore-Aminopenicillin Conjugates Reveals Selectively Potent Antipseudomonal Activity", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20120620), vol. 134, no. 24, doi:10.1021/ja303446w, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 9898 - 9901, XP055279967 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja303446w | [Y] - B. LAYEUX ET AL, "Amikacin Monotherapy for Sepsis Caused by Panresistant Pseudomonas aeruginosa", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, US, (20100907), vol. 54, no. 11, doi:10.1128/AAC.00441-10, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 4939 - 4941, XP055316946 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AAC.00441-10 | International search | [A]US2004132707 (HEINISCH LOTHAR [DE], et al); | [X] - CHENG, JI ET AL., "Iron Transport-Mediated Drug Delivery: Practical Syntheses and In Vitro Antibacterial Studies of Tris-Catecholate SiderophoreConjugates Reveals Selectively Potent Antipseudomonal Activity.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20120604), vol. 134, no. 24, pages 9898 - 9901, XP055279967 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja303446w | [A] - MARTELL, ARTHUR E. ET AL., "Development of Iron Chelators for Cooley's Anemia.", INORGANICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1987), vol. 138, pages 215 - 230, XP000566129 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0020-1693(00)81225-6 |