EP2991187 - MOBILE TERMINAL WITH MULTI-PORT CHARGING CONTROL FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huizhou TCL Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 70 Huifeng 4th Road Zhongkai Hi-Tech Development District Huizhou, Guangdong 516006 / CN | [2016/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Shiqing ZENG Hu 70 Huifeng 4th Road ZhongKai Hi-tech Development District Huizhou Guangdong 516006 / CN | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | Brachmann, Roland W. Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze Patentanwälte in Partnerschaft Dietramszeller Str. 22 83624 Otterfing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/09] | Brachmann, Roland W. Von Lieres Brachmann Schulze Patentanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 12A 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13883060.9 | 07.08.2013 | [2016/09] | WO2013CN80957 | Priority number, date | CN201310144667 | 24.04.2013 Original published format: CN201310144667 | [2016/09] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014173037 | Date: | 30.10.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2991187 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2991187 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 30.10.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, G06F1/26 | [2016/38] | CPC: |
G06F1/263 (EP,US);
G06F1/26 (US);
H02J7/00 (US);
H02J7/007182 (EP,US);
H02J7/00045 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/09] | H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILES ENDGERÄT MIT MULTIPORT-LADUNGSSTEUERUNGSFUNKTION | [2016/09] | English: | MOBILE TERMINAL WITH MULTI-PORT CHARGING CONTROL FUNCTION | [2016/09] | French: | TERMINAL MOBILE À FONCTION DE COMMANDE DE CHARGE MULTI-PORTS | [2016/09] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2015 | Translation filed | 24.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 10.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.08.2013 | AL | 20.03.2019 | AT | 20.03.2019 | CY | 20.03.2019 | CZ | 20.03.2019 | DK | 20.03.2019 | EE | 20.03.2019 | FI | 20.03.2019 | HR | 20.03.2019 | LT | 20.03.2019 | LV | 20.03.2019 | MC | 20.03.2019 | MK | 20.03.2019 | MT | 20.03.2019 | NL | 20.03.2019 | PL | 20.03.2019 | RO | 20.03.2019 | RS | 20.03.2019 | SE | 20.03.2019 | SI | 20.03.2019 | SK | 20.03.2019 | SM | 20.03.2019 | TR | 20.03.2019 | BG | 20.06.2019 | NO | 20.06.2019 | GR | 21.06.2019 | IS | 20.07.2019 | PT | 20.07.2019 | IE | 07.08.2019 | LU | 07.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 07.08.2013 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
MT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 07.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 07.08.2013 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 07.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 07.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 07.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 07.08.2019 | ||
LU | 07.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
LU | 07.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RS | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008111522 (SIMPSON RUSSELL L [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-15; | [A]US2010090644 (NOKKONEN ERKKI [FI], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]CN200994072Y (ZHIXIONG HE [CN]); | [A]CN201167243Y (QINGDAO HISENSE MOBILE COMM [CN]); | [A]CN101359836 (VIMICRO CORP BEIJING [CN]); | [XP]CN103219770 (HUIZHOU TCL MOBILE COMM CO LTD) |